EP2425811 - HAIR-DRESSING COSMETIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shiseido Company, Ltd. 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURASHIMA, Takumi c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1, Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Hideki c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1, Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 03 /
TOYODA, Tomonori c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1, Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 04 /
FUJIYAMA, Taizo c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER(SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1, Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Uchida, Kenji, et al SA Fedit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10769538.9 | 05.02.2010 | WO2010JP51669 | Priority number, date | JP20090110153 | 28.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009110153 | [2012/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010125838 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2425811 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/86, A61K8/39, A61K8/60, A61K8/81, A61Q5/06 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | HAARPFLEGEKOSMETIKUM | [2012/10] | English: | HAIR-DRESSING COSMETIC | [2012/10] | French: | COSMÉTIQUE DE MISE EN FORME CAPILLAIRE | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2011 | Translation filed | 28.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 02.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS52154529 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JPS55147216 (LION HAMIGAKI KK); | [A]JP2003160448 (MANDOM CORP); | [A]JP2003321330 (LION CORP); | [X]JP2004155724 (MANDOM CORP); | [A]JP2004182611 (MANDOM CORP); | [A]JP2005053879 (KOSE CORP); | [A]JP2006182746 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD, et al); | [AP]JP2009132625 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [AP]JP2009286757 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH03261713 | JPH11100312 | JP2002167317 | JP2004505902 | JP2006213706 | JP2007217314 |