EP2426555 - TEMPERATURE MEASURING DEVICE, MEASURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/10] | MEASURING DEVICE, MEASURING METHOD THEREFOR, WORK POSITION CORRECTING DEVICE FOR CUTTING MACHINE, WORK POSITION CORRECTING METHOD THEREFOR, IMAGE CAPTURING DEVICE, AND CUTTING MACHINE PROVIDED WITH THE IMAGE CAPTURING DEVICE | ||
[2014/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Machine Mfg. Co., Ltd. 19, Chausuyama Yama-machi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWADA, Tosuke c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Masaki c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 03 /
ICHINO, Shinji c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10769646.0 | 20.04.2010 | WO2010JP56995 | Priority number, date | JP20090109909 | 28.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009109909 | [2012/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010125947 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2426555 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2426555 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01K5/50 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
B23B25/06 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0003 (EP,US);
B23Q17/09 (US);
B23Q17/0909 (EP,US);
B23Q17/0928 (EP,US);
B23Q17/0985 (EP,US);
B23Q17/20 (EP,US);
B23Q17/249 (EP,US);
B23Q17/2495 (EP,US);
G01K5/50 (EP,US);
G01K2217/00 (EP,US);
G01N21/86 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/10] | G03B17/17, B23B25/06, B23Q17/20, B23Q17/24, G01K5/48, G03B15/00, G03B17/02, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURMESSGERÄT, MESSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/20] | English: | TEMPERATURE MEASURING DEVICE, MEASURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2014/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE TEMPÉRATURE, PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE POUR CELUI-CI | [2014/20] |
Former [2012/10] | MESSGERÄT, MESSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, VORRICHTUNG ZUR KORREKTUR DER ARBEITSPOSITION EINER SCHNEIDEMASCHINE, VERFAHREN ZUR ARBEITSPOSITIONSKORREKTUR DAFÜR, BILDERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND MIT DER BILDERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG AUSGESTATTETE SCHNEIDEMASCHINE | ||
Former [2012/10] | MEASURING DEVICE, MEASURING METHOD THEREFOR, WORK POSITION CORRECTING DEVICE FOR CUTTING MACHINE, WORK POSITION CORRECTING METHOD THEREFOR, IMAGE CAPTURING DEVICE, AND CUTTING MACHINE PROVIDED WITH THE IMAGE CAPTURING DEVICE | ||
Former [2012/10] | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE, PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE POUR CELUI-CI, DISPOSITIF DE CORRECTION DE POSITION DE TRAVAIL POUR MACHINE À COUPER, PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION DE POSITION DE TRAVAIL POUR CELUI-CI, DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE ET MACHINE À COUPER COMPORTANT LE DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2011 | Translation filed | 26.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 24.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2010 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BE | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | ES | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | IT | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MK | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | SM | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | GB | 20.04.2015 | IE | 20.04.2015 | LU | 20.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | FR | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 20.04.2010 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 20.04.2015 | ||
IE | 20.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 20.04.2010 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 20.04.2015 | ||
IE | 20.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 20.04.2015 | ||
IE | 20.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 20.04.2015 | ||
IE | 20.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 20.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 20.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 20.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05133813 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]WO8707550 (MAS VERTRIEBS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]JP2009061565 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 | International search | [A]JPH05133813 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH05133814 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH08255819 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH1199449 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]EP1130372 (SEMICONDUCTOR 300 GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]JP2006010445 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2009061565 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [XP]WO2009125577 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) |