|
04.01.2018 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.11.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.03.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
04.11.2010 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
17 |