24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
29.12.2017 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
11.09.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
09.08.2017 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
06.06.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
07.08.2016 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
24.06.2016 |
Opposition filed |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
28.08.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
21.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.08.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
29.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
20.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
20.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
06.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
17.02.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
11.02.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|