Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012045358 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010KR02625 | 27.04.2010 | KR20100026584 | 25.03.2010 | KR20090036963 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101193718B | Global Dossier | 22.10.2012 | B1 | KR20110107473 | 04.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100026584 | 25.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101140931B | Global Dossier | 03.05.2012 | B1 | KR20100118238 | 05.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090036963 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5437482B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2014 | B2 | JP2012525500 | 22.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010KR02625 | 27.04.2010 | KR20100026584 | 25.03.2010 | KR20090036963 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102439188 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010KR02625 | 27.04.2010 | KR20100026584 | 25.03.2010 | KR20090036963 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2431492 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B1 | EP2431492 | 22.01.2014 | A4 | EP2431492 | 21.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010KR02625 | 27.04.2010 | KR20100026584 | 25.03.2010 | KR20090036963 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010126268 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2011 | A3 | WO2010126268 | 04.11.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100026584 | 25.03.2010 | KR20090036963 | 28.04.2009 |