EP2424661 - ZEOLITE Y [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PQ Corporation 300 Lindenwood Drive Valleybrooke Corporate Center Malvern, PA 19355-1740 / US | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, David Allen 124 Harper Avenue Morrisville, PA 19067 / US | 02 /
OUWEHAND, Cornelius Brahmstraat 117 1447 RK Purmerend / NL | 03 /
DOMOKOS, László Schothorsterlaan 55 3822 NA Amersfoort / NL | 04 /
ONG, Lay Hwa Blk 652 Senja Link, 13-22 Senja Link 670652 / SG | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Stafford, Jonathan Alan Lewis, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2020/51] |
Former [2013/12] | Atkinson, Peter Birch Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2012/10] | Instone, Terry Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10770236.7 | 28.04.2010 | [2020/51] | WO2010US32691 | Priority number, date | US20090173698P | 29.04.2009 Original published format: US 173698 P | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010126955 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2424661 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2424661 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/24, B01J20/18, C01B39/02, B01J20/30 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
B01J20/3078 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J29/084 (KR);
B01J20/186 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01B39/026 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01B39/24 (EP,CN,US);
C07C7/13 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | B01J29/08, B01J37/00, B01J20/18, C01B39/02 | ||
Former IPC [2012/10] | B01J29/08, B01J37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | AL | 22.09.2011 | BA | 22.09.2011 | ME | 22.09.2011 | RS | 22.09.2011 | Title | German: | ZEOLIT Y | [2012/10] | English: | ZEOLITE Y | [2012/10] | French: | ZÉOLITE Y | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 21.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2020 | 06.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2010 | AT | 16.12.2020 | CY | 16.12.2020 | CZ | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | ES | 16.12.2020 | FI | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | LV | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MK | 16.12.2020 | MT | 16.12.2020 | PL | 16.12.2020 | RO | 16.12.2020 | SE | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | SM | 16.12.2020 | TR | 16.12.2020 | BG | 16.03.2021 | NO | 16.03.2021 | GR | 17.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | PT | 16.04.2021 | IE | 28.04.2021 | LU | 28.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 28.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
MK | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
TR | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
MK | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 28.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4331694 (IZOD THOMAS P J) [X] 13-15 * column II, line 23 - column IV, line 66 *; | [A]EP0140608 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 1 - page 11, line 25 *; | [XI]US2002094931 (WANG FENGLAI [CN], et al) [X] 6 * paragraphs [0011] - [0050] * [I] 1-5,7-12; | [A]WO2004044098 (CHEVRON USA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 9, line 7 - page 15, line 18 *; | [XI]WO2004047988 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 6 * page 3, line 17 - page 12, line 20 * [I] 1-5,7-12; | [A] - MAKAROVA M A ET AL, "Broensted acidity in US-Y zeolites", STUDIES IN SURFACE SCIENCE AND CATALYSIS; ZEOLITES AND RELATED MICROPOROUS MATERIALS: STATE OF THE ART 1994 : PROCEEDINGS OF THE 10TH INTERNATIONAL ZEOLITE CONFERENCE, ELSEVIER B.V, NL; GARMISCH-PARTENKIRCHEN, GERMANY, vol. 84, no. Part A, doi:10.1016/S0167-2991(08)64134-8, ISSN 0167-2991, (19940101), pages 365 - 372, (20080529), XP008166231 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2991(08)64134-8 | [A] - THOMAS ROBERT HUGHES ET AL, "A study of the surface structure of decationized Y zeolite by quantitative infrared spectroscopy", THE JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, (19670601), vol. 71, no. 7, doi:10.1021/j100866a035, ISSN 0022-3654, pages 2192 - 2201, XP055092432 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j100866a035 | International search | [Y]US4331694 (IZOD THOMAS P J); | [X]WO2004047988 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) | by applicant | US3130007 | US4085069 | EP0247678 | EP0247679 | US5435987 | WO2004047988 | WO2004050548 | WO2005084799 | - LIPPENSLINSENDE BOER, Journal of Catalysis, (19640000), pages 3 - 32 | - S. BRUNAUERP. EMMETTE. TELLER, J. Am. Chm. Soc., (19380000), vol. 60, page 309 |