Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
27.11.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.06.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.03.2015 | Change - representative | |
24.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.03.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.03.2014 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
14.03.2014 | Change - classification | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
14.03.2014 | Change - classification | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
16.04.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.07.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
03.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.02.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
03.02.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
07.12.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.11.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.11.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.11.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.11.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |