EP2424594 - AUTOMATIC INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd Clarendon House 2, Church Street HM 11 Hamilton / BM | [2013/38] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Abbott Biotechnology Ltd Clarendon House Hamilton HM 11 / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHANG, Sherwin, S. 346 Southgate Drive Vernon Hills IL 60061 / US | 02 /
OZDARYAL, Esra 1665 Cranshire Ct. Deerfield IL 60015 / US | 03 /
PLEW, Marc, M. 2446 Lawson Blvd. Gurnee IL 60031 / US | 04 /
SZECHINSKI, William, P. 5954 N. Forest Glen Chicago IL 60646 / US | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10770353.0 | 29.04.2010 | WO2010US33012 | Priority number, date | US20090286766P | 15.12.2009 Original published format: US 286766 P | US20090173952P | 29.04.2009 Original published format: US 173952 P | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010127146 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2424594 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
A61M5/2033 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/315 (US);
A61M5/20 (US);
A61M5/31511 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/3157 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/31578 (KR,US);
A61M2005/206 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2005/2073 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/584 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2012/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 23.11.2011 | BA | 23.11.2011 | ME | 23.11.2011 | RS | 23.11.2011 | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/10] | English: | AUTOMATIC INJECTION DEVICE | [2012/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION AUTOMATIQUE | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 22.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3882863 (SARNOFF STANLEY J, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO9116094 (SURVIVAL TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006129122 (WYRICK RONALD E [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008005315 (ABBOTT BIOTECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008281271 (GRIFFITHS STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4689042 (SARNOFF STANLEY J [US], et al); | [Y]US5334144 (ALCHAS PAUL G [US], et al); | [Y]US2004054327 (GILLESPIE RICHARD D [US]) | Examination | US4316463 |