|
20.09.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2016 |
Request for correction of client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Request for correction of client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2015 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2012 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
101 |