Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010127174 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010127171 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008124650 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008124649 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A3 | WO2008124649 | 16.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008124641 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2008 | A3 | WO2008124641 | 16.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008058212 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2008 | A9 | WO2008058212 | 31.07.2008 | A3 | WO2008058212 | 15.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US93600307 | 06.11.2007 | US85744006 | 07.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008058157 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2008 | A3 | WO2008058157 | 15.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92335707 | 24.10.2007 | US85744006 | 07.11.2006 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024216004 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816190770 | 14.11.2018 | US201514983024 | 29.12.2015 | US202418409153 | 10.01.2024 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US201514680276 | 07.04.2015 | US201615365502 | 30.11.2016 | US202117357993 | 25.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016106466 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514981317 | 28.12.2015 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US95185307 | 06.12.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9539019 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2017 | B2 | US2016106454 | 21.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514983024 | 29.12.2015 | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US201514680276 | 07.04.2015 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9339288 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2016 | B2 | US2015209080 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US201514680276 | 07.04.2015 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9301770 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2016 | B2 | US2014107404 | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9822408 | 04.04.2008 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US201314013775 | 29.08.2013 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012067352 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93600307 | 06.11.2007 | US201113216046 | 23.08.2011 | US85744006 | 07.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011077674 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US97223310 | 17.12.2010 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011034943 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US91735110 | 01.11.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009270898 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8951274 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2015 | B2 | US2009270897 | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9095366 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2009270896 | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009270895 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009270812 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8574253 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2013 | B2 | US2008249553 | 09.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9259233 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2016 | B2 | US2008249534 | 09.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US95185307 | 06.12.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008249366 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8528563 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2013 | B2 | US2008245371 | 09.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9822408 | 04.04.2008 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9392935 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2016 | B2 | US2008146873 | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85744006 | 07.11.2006 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US92348207 | 24.10.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008146872 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92335707 | 24.10.2007 | US85744006 | 07.11.2006 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8025656 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2011 | B2 | US2008135053 | 12.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93600307 | 06.11.2007 | US85744006 | 07.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11903602 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2024 | B2 | US2022047291 | 17.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816190770 | 14.11.2018 | US201514983024 | 29.12.2015 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US201514680276 | 07.04.2015 | US201615365502 | 30.11.2016 | US202117357993 | 25.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11045217 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2021 | B2 | US2019183528 | 20.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816190770 | 14.11.2018 | US201514983024 | 29.12.2015 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US201514680276 | 07.04.2015 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US201615365502 | 30.11.2016 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10130389 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2018 | B2 | US2017079684 | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514983024 | 29.12.2015 | US9825008 | 04.04.2008 | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US9831808 | 04.04.2008 | US201514680276 | 07.04.2015 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US201615365502 | 30.11.2016 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3132760 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2018 | B1 | EP3132760 | 22.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | EP10770377 | 29.04.2010 | WO2010US33050 | 29.04.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2142081 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2011 | A4 | EP2142081 | 13.01.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US59503 | 04.04.2008 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2134283 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2014 | B1 | EP2134283 | 23.03.2011 | A4 | EP2134283 | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US59504 | 04.04.2008 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2134237 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2011 | A4 | EP2134237 | 23.12.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | WO2008US59493 | 04.04.2008 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2089091 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2010 | A4 | EP2089091 | 19.08.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92335707 | 24.10.2007 | US85744006 | 07.11.2006 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | WO2007US83833 | 06.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2083771 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2010 | A4 | EP2083771 | 05.08.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US93600307 | 06.11.2007 | WO2007US83982 | 07.11.2007 | US85744006 | 07.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105726095 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | WO2010US33050 | 29.04.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102438534B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | B | CN102438534 | 02.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | WO2010US33050 | 29.04.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2760328 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2017 | C | CA2760328 | 04.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | WO2010US33050 | 29.04.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010242907B | Global Dossier | 21.05.2015 | B2 | AU2010242907 | 15.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | WO2010US33050 | 29.04.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2424449 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2016 | B1 | EP2424449 | 27.05.2015 | A4 | EP2424449 | 07.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | WO2010US33050 | 29.04.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1015278 | 23.02.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | WO2010US33050 | 29.04.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2615827T | 08.06.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | WO2010US33050 | 29.04.2010 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2687119T | 23.10.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43268609 | 29.04.2009 | US43269109 | 29.04.2009 | US43270209 | 29.04.2009 | US91062507 | 06.04.2007 | US43267509 | 29.04.2009 | US98691207 | 09.11.2007 | US91061807 | 06.04.2007 | US43264709 | 29.04.2009 | Type | Divisional application | EP3132760 |