EP2425402 - SYSTEM FOR PHOTOACOUSTIC IMAGING AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visualsonics, Inc. 3080 Yonge Street Suite 6100 Box 66 Toronto, Ontario M4N 3N1 / CA | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRSON, Desmond 73 Ventura Avenue Thornhill Ontario L4J 7T4 / CA | 02 /
MEHI, James, I. 89 Degas Drive Thornhill Ontario L4J 9J3 / CA | 03 /
NEEDLES, Andrew 117 Kalmar Avenue Toronto Ontario M1N 3G6 / CA | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Magrath, Sally Ann Mason Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Magrath, Sally Ann Mason Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10770394.4 | 30.04.2010 | WO2010US33086 | Priority number, date | US20090174571P | 01.05.2009 Original published format: US 174571 P | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010127199 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2425402 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
G01S15/8993 (EP,US);
A61B5/0073 (EP,US);
A61B5/0095 (EP,US);
G01N21/1702 (EP,US);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0204 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR FOTOAKUSTISCHE BILDGEBUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2012/10] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PHOTOACOUSTIC IMAGING AND RELATED METHODS | [2012/10] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE PHOTOACOUSTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS APPARENTÉS | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006184042 (WANG LIHONG [US], et al); | [A]US2008221647 (CHAMBERLAND DAVID L [US], et al); | [A]US2004127783 (KRUGER ROBERT A [US]); | [A]US2008108867 (ZHOU GAN [US]); | [A]US2008123083 (WANG XUEDING [US], et al) |