EP2630811 - HEARING INSTRUMENT COMPRISING A RECHARGEABLE POWER SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonova AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2015/52] |
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states Sonova AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | ||
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Phonak AG Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGST, Jan Wässeri 17 CH-8816 Hirzel / CH | 02 /
KARAMUK, Erdal Weiernmatt 4 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | 03 /
MEIER, Hilmar Forchstr 504 CH-8704 Herrliberg / CH | 04 /
HUG, Roland Alpenblickstr. 9 CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | 05 /
VONLANTHEN, Andi Hofmatt 14 CH-5452 Oberrohrdorf / CH | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/35] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10770529.5 | 19.10.2010 | [2015/52] | WO2010EP65720 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011000974 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2630811 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2630811 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, // H02J7/02 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04R2225/31 (EP,US);
H04R25/602 (EP,US);
H04R25/606 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖRINSTRUMENT MIT EINER AUFLADBAREN STROMQUELLE | [2013/35] | English: | HEARING INSTRUMENT COMPRISING A RECHARGEABLE POWER SOURCE | [2013/35] | French: | INSTRUMENT AUDITIF COMPRENANT UNE SOURCE D'ÉNERGIE RECHARGEABLE | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2010 | AL | 23.12.2015 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | RS | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | SM | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BG | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BG | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
RS | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1381069 (SHIMANO KK [JP]); | [A]US7023687 (STERZEL HANS-JOSEF [DE], et al); | [IDY]WO2006077192 (OTICON AS [DK], et al); | [Y]US2008316678 (EHRENBERG SCOTT G [US], et al); | by applicant | US4048593 | DE3623304 | EP0376948 | WO9955131 | US7023687 | US2008137890 |