EP2481205 - METHOD FOR CONFIGURING THE RINGTONE OF A TERMINAL AND DEVICE SUITABLE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states France Telecom 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESOMBE, Philippe 16 Résidence Ernest Renan F-22700 Louannec / FR | 02 /
TOUTAIN, François 5 Square des Pierres Noires F-22700 Louannec / FR | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10770567.5 | 16.09.2010 | WO2010FR51920 | Priority number, date | FR20090056503 | 22.09.2009 Original published format: FR 0956503 | [2012/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011036379 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2481205 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/02, H04M7/00, H04M19/04 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
H04M3/02 (EP);
H04M7/006 (EP);
H04M2201/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION DES KLINGELTONS EINES ENDGERÄTS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG DES BESAGTEN VERFAHRENS | [2012/31] | English: | METHOD FOR CONFIGURING THE RINGTONE OF A TERMINAL AND DEVICE SUITABLE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD | [2012/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE PARAMETRAGE DE LA SONNERIE D'UN TERMINAL ET EQUIPEMENT APTE A METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 12.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US7443967 (SILVER EDWARD MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,3-11 * abstract * * figures 1-16 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 53 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 2 * [A] 2; | [AD]WO2008110218 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 14 - page 6, line 22 * * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 23 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO2008110218 |