EP2501601 - STEERING COLUMN ASSEMBLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/50] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Detlef Autal 12 22869 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
HARTMANN, Horst Katerstieg 22 22969 Witzhave / DE | 03 /
KIRCHNER, Jens-Werner Tostedter Weg 23 21244 Buchholz Holm Seppensen / DE | 04 /
KITTLER, Holger Kühnehöfe 19 22761 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
MILICEVIC, Ivica Bergheide 55A 21149 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
PRIGGE, Ralf Hinterm Eichhof 10 21357 Bardowick / DE | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | ||
Former [2012/39] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10771015.4 | 19.10.2010 | WO2010EP06385 | Priority number, date | DE20091054245 | 21.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009054245 | [2012/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011060865 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501601 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2501601 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/184 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
B62D1/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LENKSÄULENANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN KRAFTWAGEN | [2012/39] | English: | STEERING COLUMN ASSEMBLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2012/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COLONNE DE DIRECTION POUR UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 29.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2010 | AL | 10.12.2014 | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | CZ | 10.12.2014 | DK | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | ES | 10.12.2014 | FI | 10.12.2014 | HR | 10.12.2014 | IT | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MK | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | NL | 10.12.2014 | PL | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | RS | 10.12.2014 | SE | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | SM | 10.12.2014 | TR | 10.12.2014 | NO | 10.03.2015 | GR | 11.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MK | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
TR | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
TR | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 10.12.2014 | |
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 10.12.2014 | |
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 10.12.2014 | |
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 10.12.2014 | |
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CZ | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 10.12.2014 | |
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 10.12.2014 | |
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0900943 (LEMFORDER NACAM SA [FR]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0025]; figures 2,3,5,7-9 * [I] 8; | [XI]DE102006034714 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,5,6 * [I] 3,4,6,8; | [XA]EP1125821 (FAURECIA IND [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [A] 2-8 | by applicant | DE102007053672 |