EP2496453 - METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT AN EMERGENCY BRAKING PROCEDURE IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEIBFRIED, Oliver Munsbacher Str. 5 74936 Siegelsbach / DE | 02 /
SCHMAUTZ, Oliver Lauffener Str. 29 71720 Oberstenfeld / DE | 03 /
DOBERSCHUETZ, Christian Ziegelstr. 7 71672 Marbach / DE | 04 /
LAUXMANN, Ralph Ludwigsburger Str. 19/1 70825 Korntal-Muenchingen / DE | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/37] | Application number, filing date | 10771081.6 | 20.10.2010 | WO2010EP65763 | Priority number, date | DE20091046339 | 03.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009046339 | [2012/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011054668 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2496453 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/1755, B60T8/32, B60T8/40 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T8/4059 (EP,US);
B60T8/4872 (EP,US);
B60T2201/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES NOTBREMSVORGANGS IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2012/37] | English: | METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT AN EMERGENCY BRAKING PROCEDURE IN A VEHICLE | [2012/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT L'EXÉCUTION D'UN PROCESSUS DE FREINAGE D'URGENCE DANS UN VÉHICULE | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 13.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0982207 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,10-13 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 9A,9B * [I] 4-9,14; | [XP]DE102008041498 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [XP] 1-14* the whole document * | Examination | WO2010023003 |