EP2494314 - MEASURING ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A ROTATIONAL MOVEMENT AS WELL AS LABYRINTH SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORLING, Peter Hennebergstraße 48 97453 Schonungen-Mainberg / DE | 02 /
KERN, Henning Elsa-Brändström-Straße 72 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 03 /
KERN-TRAUTMANN, Andreas Riemenschneiderstraße 39a 97230 Estenfeld / DE | 04 /
SEUBERLING, Mathias Raiffeisenstraße 9 97633 Großeibstadt / DE | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/37] | 01 /
HORLING, Peter Hennebergstraße 48 97453 Schonungen-Mainberg / DE | ||
02 /
KERN, Henning Elsa-Brändström-Straße 72 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | |||
03 /
KERN-TRAUTMANN, Andreas Riemenschneiderstraße 39a 97230 Estenfeld / DE | |||
04 /
SEUBERLING, Mathias Am Rennweg 24 97631 Bad Königshofen / DE | |||
Former [2012/36] | 01 /
HORLING, Peter Hennebergstraße 48 97453 Schonungen-Mainberg / DE | ||
02 /
KERN, Henning Petrinistraße 9 97080 Würzburg / DE | |||
03 /
KERN-TRAUTMANN, Andreas Riemenschneiderstraße 39a 97230 Estenfeld / DE | |||
04 /
SEUBERLING, Mathias Am Rennweg 24 97631 Bad Königshofen / DE | Representative(s) | Schonecke, Mitja SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Schonecke, Mitja SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 10771110.3 | 28.10.2010 | WO2010EP66301 | Priority number, date | DE20091051353 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009051353 | [2012/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011051363 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2494314 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/245 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
G01D5/2455 (EP);
F16C33/80 (EP);
F16C41/007 (EP);
F16C19/38 (EP);
F16C23/086 (EP);
F16C2300/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | MESSANORDNUNG UND -VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG EINER DREHBEWEGUNG SOWIE LABYRINTHDICHTUNG | [2012/36] | English: | MEASURING ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A ROTATIONAL MOVEMENT AS WELL AS LABYRINTH SEAL | [2012/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MESURE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UNE ROTATION AINSI QUE GARNITURE EN LABYRINTHE | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE2907797 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,2,9 * page 7, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph l - page 13, paragraph 1; figure 1b * * page 15, line 1 - line 12; figure 3d * [I] 3,5,6,10-12; | [XI]JPS61120919 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract * [I] 3,5,6; | [X]EP0309853 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 7 * abstract * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 7; figure 2 *; | [XI]EP0953494 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0 28]; figure 1 * [I] 5; | [X]JP2005233870 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 1,4,7-9 * abstract *; | [I]US2005201648 (TAKADA SEIICHI [JP]) [I] 7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033]; figure 2 ** paragraph [0035]; figure 1 * |