EP2494826 - METHOD FOR RANGE EXTENSION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/52] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Fang-Chen 4 Brookview Circle Randolph NJ 07869 / US | 02 /
LEE, Jung Ah 40 Grove Farm Road Pittstown NJ 08867 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2012/36] | 2SPL Patentanwälte Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10773789.2 | 26.10.2010 | WO2010US54001 | Priority number, date | US20090280071P | 29.10.2009 Original published format: US 280071 P | US20100909256 | 21.10.2010 Original published format: US 909256 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011059689 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494826 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494826 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
H04W56/0005 (EP,BR,US);
H04W56/00 (KR);
H04W56/0045 (EP,BR,US);
H04W56/006 (EP,BR,US);
H04W92/10 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREICHSERWEITERUNG IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2012/36] | English: | METHOD FOR RANGE EXTENSION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2012/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLARGISSEMENT DE PLAGE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 13.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2010 | AL | 24.12.2014 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BE | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | DK | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | ES | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | HR | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | LT | 24.12.2014 | LV | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | MK | 24.12.2014 | MT | 24.12.2014 | NL | 24.12.2014 | PL | 24.12.2014 | PT | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | RS | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | SM | 24.12.2014 | TR | 24.12.2014 | NO | 24.03.2015 | GR | 25.03.2015 | IS | 24.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/37] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PT | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 24.12.2014 | |
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 24.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005025095 (KIM HOE-WON [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] * * figure - * * claim - *; | [AP]WO2008150206 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [AP] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 6 * * page 9, lines 7-20 * * page 12, lines 4-12 * * figure - * * claim - *; | [A]EP1235367 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * figure - * * claim - *; | [A]US2004196811 (LOGALBO ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20070741068 | US19710612800 |