EP2470061 - WEARABLE SYSTEMS FOR AUDIO, VISUAL AND GAZE MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states École Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL) EPFL-SRI Station 10 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLARD, Aude Rue du Centre 42A CH-1025 St-Sulpice / CH | 02 /
NORIS, Basilio Rue du Simplon 6 CH-1006 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
KELLER, Jean-Baptiste Avenue Dent-d'Oche 2 CH-1007 Lausanne / CH | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 10773980.7 | 26.08.2010 | WO2010IB53835 | Priority number, date | US20090236895P | 26.08.2009 Original published format: US 236895 P | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011024134 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2470061 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/113 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
A61B3/113 (EP,US);
A61B3/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE SYSTEME FÜR AUDIO-, VIDEO UND BLICKÜBERWACHUNG | [2012/27] | English: | WEARABLE SYSTEMS FOR AUDIO, VISUAL AND GAZE MONITORING | [2012/27] | French: | SYSTÈMES PORTÉS SUR LE CORPS POUR SURVEILLANCE AUDIO, VISUELLE ET DU REGARD | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.02.2020 | 17.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 03.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.07.2020 | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/34] | 01.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.2016 | 31.08.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4852988 (VELEZ JOSE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,12-14 * figures 1-3,6 * * column 1, line 11 - line 25 * * column 8, line 16 - line 21 * * column 8, line 53 - line 60 * * column 9, line 10 - line 14 * * column 9, line 25 - line 28 * * column 9, line 59 * * column 12, line 64 - line 68 * [I] 5-9,11; | [XI]US6847336 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11-14 * figures 1A,1C,2 * * column 9, line 38 - line 45 * * column 9, line 49 - line 53 * * column 11, line 16 - line 28 * * column 12, line 13 - line 16 * * column 15, line 39 * * column 15, line 41 - line 45 * * column 15, lines 50-54 * [I] 4,6-10; | [A]US2005195277 (YAMASAKI MASAFUMI [JP]) [A] 5,6 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0097] *; | [A]US2007201847 (LEI TIANMO [US]) [A] 7-9 * figures 2a,2b * * paragraph [0019] * | by applicant | WO9905988 | WO2004066097 | WO2007043954 | WO2006102495 | US7206022 | - BILLARD AUDE ET AL., "SEEING THROUGH THE EYES OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM SPECTRUM DISORDERS", JOURNAL OF AUTISM RESEARCH (SUBMITTED 2010) |