EP2494250 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PIPE COUPLINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Fire Products LP 1400 Pennbrook Parkway Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPPKA, Sandra, M. 89 Lillian Court Warwick RI 02886 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/36] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10774372.6 | 25.10.2010 | [2015/37] | WO2010US53970 | Priority number, date | US20090255409P | 27.10.2009 Original published format: US 255409 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011056512 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494250 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494250 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L17/04, F16L21/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
F16L17/04 (EP,KR,US);
F16L21/065 (KR);
F16J15/02 (KR);
F16L17/06 (KR);
F16L21/005 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | F16L17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR ROHRKOPPLUNGEN | [2012/36] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PIPE COUPLINGS | [2012/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR RACCORDS DE TUYAUTERIES | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | MT | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | RS | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | IE | 25.10.2015 | LU | 25.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | BG | 09.09.2015 | |
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | BG | 09.09.2015 | |
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BG | 09.09.2015 | |
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | EE | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | EE | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | EE | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | EE | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | EE | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | EE | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/18] | HR | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | HR | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | HR | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US1607943 (JAMES CARSON, et al) [X] 13-18,20,25-28 * page 1, line 103 - page 2, line 95; figure - * [I] 1-9,19; | [XY]US2028182 (BARNICKOL JR FERD) [X] 20-24 * page 2, column r, lines 16-49; figures 7-18 * [Y] 16-19; | [XY]DE925743 (INGBUERO HOLLENDER & CO) [X] 20-24 * page 2, lines 43-103; figure 2 * [Y] 16-19; | [XA]DE1132394 (TORFIT WERKE G A HASEKE & CO) [X] 20,25,28 * column 3, lines 13-37; figure 2 * [A] 26,27; | [XY]GB913904 (CORNING GLASS WORKS) [X] 20-24 * page 2, lines 7-85; figure - * [Y] 16-19; | [XY]US3129920 (STILLWAGON CRAWFORD K) [X] 20-24 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 63; figure - * [Y] 16-19; | [XY]FR2184203 (EVERITUBE [FR]) [X] 20-24 * page 4, lines 16-35; figures 6,7 * [Y] 16-19; | [XY]US4350350 (BLAKELEY JAMES) [X] 20-24 * abstract * * column 4, lines 29-54 * [Y] 16-19; | [I]US5961161 (SPONER WOLFGANG [AT]) [I] 25 * abstract ** column 4, lines 8-24; figures 3,4 *; | [XAY]DE10006029 (VIEREGGE UWE [DE]) [X] 1,10-13 * abstract * * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 4; figure 7 * * column 8, lines 26-41; figure 11 * [A] 29 [Y] 16-19; | [XAY]WO2004097270 (VICTAULIC CO OF AMERICA [US], et al) [X] 13 * abstract * * page 12, paragraph l - page 15, paragraph 2 * [A] 29 [Y] 16-19; | [XAY]US2005253383 (GIBB JOHN [CA], et al) [X] 1,10-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0025]; figure 3 * [A] 29 [Y] 16-19; | [XAY]WO2009045525 (ANVIL INTERNATIONAL LP [US], et al) [X] 1,10-13 * abstract * * page 5, line 9 - page 7, line 6; figures 3-7 * * page 8, lines 21-28; figure 11 * [A] 29 [Y] 16-19; | [XA]WO2009107061 (STRAUB WERKE AG [CH], et al) [X] 25 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraphs 2,3 * [A] 26-28 | by applicant | US6139069 | DE10006029 | US2005253383 | US20090255351 |