EP2431164 - DEVICE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING A TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/12] | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING TIRE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING TIRE | ||
[2015/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Takasumi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center 1-1 Ogawa Higashi-cho 3-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2014/30] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10774855.0 | 06.05.2010 | [2016/01] | WO2010JP57775 | Priority number, date | JP20090114795 | 11.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009114795 | [2012/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010131598 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431164 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2431164 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/30 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
B29D30/3007 (EP,US);
B29C65/7847 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/4324 (EP,US);
B29C66/49 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/72141 (EP,US);
B29C66/73752 (EP,US);
B29C66/92 (US);
B29C66/98 (EP,US);
B29D30/30 (EP,US);
B29D30/42 (EP,US);
B29D30/44 (EP,US);
B29D30/46 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0081 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29D2030/3078 (EP,US);
B29D2030/3085 (EP,US);
B29D2030/421 (EP,US);
B29D2030/423 (EP,US);
B29D2030/426 (EP,US);
B29D2030/4443 (EP,US);
B29D2030/4456 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212, B29K2301/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REIFENHERSTELLUNG | [2015/33] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING A TIRE | [2015/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATIN DE PNEUS | [2015/33] |
Former [2012/12] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REIFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REIFEN | ||
Former [2012/12] | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING TIRE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING TIRE | ||
Former [2012/12] | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE BANDAGES DE ROUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BANDAGES DE ROUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2011 | Translation filed | 08.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 27.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.01.2016 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | GB | 06.05.2016 | IE | 06.05.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | LU | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0518691 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 6, line 8 - column 15, line 19; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0447273 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 7, line 52 - column 18, line 25; figures 1-19 *; | [A]US5582664 (SERGEL HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 5; figure 1 *; | [A]US4769104 (OKUYAMA KOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 40 - column 8, line 44; figures 1-8e *; | [A]US5111722 (TADA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 59 - column 13, line 15; figures 1-11 * | International search | [A]JPH10146901 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JPH07232382 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) | by applicant | JPH0740460 |