EP2431463 - TEST AGENT FOR VISCERAL OBESITY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shionogi & Co., Ltd. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | For all designated states SHIGA UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCE Seta Tsukinowa-cho Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2192 / JP | For all designated states Riken 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Shionogi & Co., Ltd. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHIGA UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCE Seta Tsukinowa-cho Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2192 / JP | |||
For all designated states Riken 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Yoshihiro c/o SHIONOGI&CO. LTD. 1-1 Futaba-cho 3-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0825 / JP | 02 /
ROKUSHIMA, Masatomo c/o SHIONOGI&CO. LTD. 12-4 Sagisu 5-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0002 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Minoru c/o SHIONOGI&CO. LTD. 1405 Gotanda Koka-cho Koka-shi Shiga 520-3423 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Tatsuya c/o SHIONOGI&CO. LTD. 1-1 Futaba-cho 3-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0825 / JP | 05 /
IKEDA, Minoru c/o SHIONOGI&CO. LTD. 12-4 Sagisu 5-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0002 / JP | 06 /
KASHIWAGI, Atsunori c/o Shiga University of Medical Science Setatsukinowa-cho Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2192 / JP | 07 /
MAEGAWA, Hiroshi c/o Shiga University of Medical Science Setatsukinowa-cho Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2192 / JP | 08 /
TANI, Tohru c/o Shiga University of Medical Science Setatsukinowa-cho Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2192 / JP | 09 /
MAEDA, Shiro c/o RIKEN Yokohama Institute 7-22 Suehiro-cho 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0045 / JP | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10774961.6 | 13.05.2010 | WO2010JP58097 | Priority number, date | JP20090116323 | 13.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009116323 | [2012/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010131704 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431463 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, A61K31/7088, A61K31/7105, A61K39/395, A61K48/00, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/53 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2799/027 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | TESTMITTEL FÜR VISZERALE ADIPOSITAS UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2012/12] | English: | TEST AGENT FOR VISCERAL OBESITY AND USE THEREOF | [2012/12] | French: | AGENT D'ESSAI POUR L'OBÉSITÉ VISCÉRALE ET SON UTILISATION | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | Translation filed | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 10.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MAKOTO NISHIDA ET AL, "Pathophysiological significance of adiponectin", MEDICAL MOLECULAR MORPHOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, TO, (20070618), vol. 40, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S00795-007-0366-7, ISSN 1860-1499, pages 55 - 67, XP019520039 [A] 1,2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00795-007-0366-7 | International search | [X]US2003113889 (GIMENO RUTH E [US], et al); | [XP] - KOBAYASHI, S. ET AL., "Identification of a new secretory factor, CCDC3/Favine, in adipocytes and endothelial cells", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (20091230), vol. 392, pages 29 - 35, XP026877128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.12.142 | [XP] - EBERLEIN, A. ET AL., "Analysis of structure and gene expression of bovine CCDC3 gene indicates a function in fat metabolism", COMP. BIOCHEM. PHYSIOL. B, BIOCHEM. MOL. BIOL., (20100201), vol. 156, pages 19 - 25, XP026977264 | by applicant | JP2003514513 | US2003113889 | JP2007054002 | JP2009027985 | JP2009027986 | - "Expert Panel on Detection, Evaluation, and Treatment of High Blood Cholesterol in Adults : Executive Summary of The Third Report of The National Cholesterol Education Program (NCEP) Expert Panel on Detection, Evaluation, and Treatment of High Blood Cholesterol in Adults (Adult Treatment Panel III", JAMA, (2001), vol. 285, pages 2486 - 2497 | - "Metabolic Syndrome Diagnose Criteria Exploratory Committee: Definition and Diagnose Criteria of Metabolic Syndrome", THE JAPANESE SOCIETY OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, (2005), vol. 94, pages 794 - 809 | - "The Examination Committee of Criteria for 'Obesity Disease' in Japan, Japan Society for the Study of Obesity : New criteria for 'obesity disease' in Japan", CIRC J, (2002), vol. 66, pages 987 - 992 | - S YAMADA; Y TSUKAMOTO; J IRIE, "Waist circumference in metabolic syndrome", LANCET, (2007), vol. 370, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(07)61656-0, pages 1541 - 42, XP022324540 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(07)61656-0 | - S YAMAMOTO; T NAKAGAWA; S KUSANO; M TAKAMURA; K HATTORI; M IROKAWA, "Development of the Automated Diagnosis System CT Screening for Visceral Obesity", MEDIX, (2004), vol. 41, pages 15 - 20 | - NAT CLIN PRACT CARDIOVASC MED, (2006), vol. 3, pages 482 - 489 | - OBESITY RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 13, pages 381 - 490 | - AOKI ET AL., "Dehydroepiandrosterone decreases elevated hepatic glucose production in C57BL/KsJ-db/db mice", LIFE SCIENCES, (2004), vol. 74, pages 3075 - 3084 | - CONSOLI ET AL., "Predominant Role of Gluconeogenesis in Increased Hepatic Glucose Production in NIDDM", DIABETES, (1989), vol. 38, pages 550 - 557 | - "IUPAc-IUB communication on Biological Nomenclature", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 138, page 9 | - "Guide to Molecular Cloning Techniques", BERGER; KIMMEL, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 152 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 303 - 308 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, GREENE PUBLISHING ASSOCIATES AND WILEY-INTERSCIENCE | - Immunochemistry in Practice, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS |