EP2429690 - NATURAL DRAFT AIR COOLED STEAM CONDENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/12] | NATURAL DRAFT AIR COOLED STEAM CONDENSER AND METHOD | ||
[2020/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPG Dry Cooling USA LLC 7401 West 129th Street Overland Park KS 66213 / US | [2019/31] |
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states SPX Dry Cooling USA LLC 7401 West 129th Street Overland Park, KS 66213 / US | ||
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states SPX Cooling Technologies Inc. 7401 West 129th Street Overland Park, KS 66213 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHREY, Hans, Georg Schutzenstr. 94 40874 Ratingen / DE | 02 /
LEITZ, Richard Gerresheimer Str. 88 40721 Hilden / DE | 03 /
VOUCHE, Michel rue de la Herse 27 B-1170 Brussels / BE | 04 /
NAGEL, Philippe 20 avenue des Alouettes B-1780 Wemmel / BE | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | ABYOO Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | [2021/09] |
Former [2012/12] | Nguyen Van Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10775538.1 | 13.05.2010 | [2021/09] | WO2010US34725 | Priority number, date | US20090466885 | 15.05.2009 Original published format: US 466885 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010132675 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2429690 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2429690 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, F28B1/06, F28C1/14 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
F28B1/06 (EP,US);
F28C1/14 (EP,US);
F28B2001/065 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP);
Y10S261/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/12] | B01F3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH UMGEBUNGSLUFT GEKÜHLTER DAMPFKONDENSATOR | [2020/36] | English: | NATURAL DRAFT AIR COOLED STEAM CONDENSER | [2020/36] | French: | CONDENSEUR DE VAPEUR D'EAU REFROIDI PAR AIR À TIRAGE NATUREL | [2020/36] |
Former [2012/12] | DURCH UMGEBUNGSLUFT GEKÜHLTER DAMPFKONDENSATOR UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2012/12] | NATURAL DRAFT AIR COOLED STEAM CONDENSER AND METHOD | ||
Former [2012/12] | CONDENSEUR DE VAPEUR D'EAU REFROIDI PAR AIR À TIRAGE NATUREL ET PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 13.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2010 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | IE | 13.05.2021 | LU | 13.05.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | NO | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.05.2010 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 13.05.2010 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB900407 (HAPPEL GES MIT BESCHRAENKTER H) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, column 1, line 10 - page 2, column 2, line 127; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]GB974691 (HAPPEL GES MIT BESCHRAENKTER H) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, column 1, line 12 - line 40; figures 1,3,5-9,14,15 * * page 3, column 1, line 5 - line 114 *; | [Y]US3556204 (DEHNE MANFRED F) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE2251709 (TYEPLOELEKTROPROJEKT MOSKAU, et al) [X] 16 * figures 1-4; claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]FR2385066 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, line 32 - page 4, line 15; figures 4,6; claim 5 * * page 7, line 3 - line 11 *; | [Y]US4142579 (KAZANOVICH BOLESLAV B, et al) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4 *; | [Y]DE3215154 (LUMMUS CO [US]) [Y] 5,13 * abstract *; | [Y]US5139083 (LARINOFF MICHAEL W [US]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0780652 (HUDSON PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0794401 (HUDSON PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract *; | [Y] - BALOGH A ET AL, "Advanced Heller System to Improve Economics of Power Generation", (20050101), pages 1 - 39, EPRI CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED COOLING STRATEGIES/TECHNOLOGIES, MAY 31 TO JUNE 2, 2005, SACRAMENTO (CA), EPRI, US, URL: http://www.energy.ca.gov/pier/conferences+seminars/2005-06_advanced_cooling_conference/papers/I_Advanced_Heller_System_Economics_2005_feb.pdf, XP008161854 [Y] 4,12 * page 6 - page 10 * * page 29 * | International search | [Y]US4397793 (STILLMAN GERALD I [US], et al); | [Y]US5902522 (SEAWELL JESSE Q [US], et al); | [X]US7431270 (MOCKRY ELDON F [US], et al) |