EP2430072 - LIQUID MONOBENZOXAZINE BASED RESIN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | For all designated states Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Wodlands, TX 77380 / US | ||
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Wodlands, TX 77380 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIETZE, Roger 98 South Scribewood Circle The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Yen-loan 7218 Thelfor Court Spring, TX 77379 / US | 03 /
BRYANT, Mark 8900 Research Park Drive, Apt. 16 The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | [2014/12] |
Former [2012/12] | 01 /
TIETZE, Roger 98 South Scribewood Circle The Woodlands TX 77382 / US | ||
02 /
NGUYEN, Yen-loan 7218 Thelfor Court Spring TX 77379 / US | |||
03 /
BRYANT, Mark 8900 Research Park Drive Apt. 16 The Woodlands TX 77381 / US | Representative(s) | Mertesdorf, Carl-Lorenz, et al Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH Legal Services Department Klybeckstrasse 200 4057 Basel / CH | [2014/25] |
Former [2012/37] | Hoffmann, Daniele Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH Intellectual Property Department Klybeckstrasse 200 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2012/12] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10775597.7 | 14.05.2010 | WO2010US34900 | Priority number, date | US20090178188P | 14.05.2009 Original published format: US 178188 P | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010132772 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430072 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430072 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/00 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
C07D265/16 (EP,US);
C08G59/24 (EP,US);
C08G59/4014 (EP,US);
C08J5/04 (EP,US);
C08J2363/00 (EP,US);
C08J2379/04 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM AUF BASIS VON FLÜSSIGEM MONOBENZOXAZIN-HARZ | [2012/12] | English: | LIQUID MONOBENZOXAZINE BASED RESIN SYSTEM | [2012/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSINE LIQUIDE À BASE DE MONOBENZOXAZINE | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 01.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 26.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2010 | AL | 16.07.2014 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | HR | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | MK | 16.07.2014 | MT | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | SM | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | NO | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.05.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MK | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.05.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | LT | 16.07.2014 | |
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | LT | 16.07.2014 | |
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2009097013 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 7; paragraph [0032]; formula (II);; claim 1 * * page 9; paragraph [0041]; formula (V) * * examples 1-8 * * page 22 - page 23; tables 1,2 * * claims 1,4 * | International search | [Y]US5021484 (SCHREIBER HERBERT [CH], et al); | [Y]WO0061650 (EDISON POLYMER INNOVATION [US]); | [Y]US6743852 (DERSHEM STEPHEN M [US], et al) |