EP2430555 - TRANSLATION OF INPUT/OUTPUT ADDRESSES TO MEMORY ADDRESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Place Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRADDOCK, David IBM Corporation MD P318 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie New York 12601-5400 / US | 02 /
GREGG, Thomas IBM Corporation MD P314 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie New York 12601-5400 / US | 03 /
GREINER, Dan IBM Corporation MD SVL/090/F374 555 Bailey Ave Santa Teresa Lab San Jose California 95141-1003 / US | 04 /
LAIS, Eric Norman IBM Corporation MD P964 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie New York 12601-5400 / US | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Scott Anthony, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2013/35] |
Former [2012/12] | Roberts, Scott Anthony, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 10776350.0 | 08.11.2010 | WO2010EP67043 | Priority number, date | US20100821170 | 23.06.2010 Original published format: US 821170 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011160722 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430555 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430555 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16, G06F12/10 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G06F12/0292 (EP,US);
G06F13/16 (KR);
G06F12/10 (KR,US);
G06F2212/206 (EP,US);
G06F9/355 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERSETZUNG VON EINGABE-/AUSGABEADRESSEN IN SPEICHERADRESSEN | [2012/12] | English: | TRANSLATION OF INPUT/OUTPUT ADDRESSES TO MEMORY ADDRESSES | [2012/12] | French: | TRADUCTION D'ADRESSES D'ENTRÉE/SORTIE EN ADRESSES DE MÉMOIRE | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 04.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MK | 28.08.2013 | SM | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | RS | 28.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
Former [2014/10] | CY | 14.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003074541 (PLAMBECK KENNETH E [US]) [X] 1,10-12,21 * the whole document *; | [XI] - E.F. Gehringer, G.Q. Kenney, "Virtual Memory Systems", (19991231), CSC-506 -- Architecture of Parallel ComputersComputer Science Department, College of Engineering, North Carolina State University1st Summer session, 1999, URL: http://people.engr.ncsu.edu/efg/506/sum99/001/lec4-virt-mem.pdf, (20110406), XP002631523 [X] 1,10-12,21 * the whole document * [I] 2-9,13-20 | [A] - PLAMBECK K E ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT AND ATTRIBUTES OF Z/ARCHITECTURE", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020701), vol. 46, no. 4/05, ISSN 0018-8646, pages 367 - 379, XP001236151 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - "z/Architecture Principles of Operation, Chapter 3", INTERNET CITATION, (20080201), pages 1 - 70, URL: http://publibz.boulder.ibm.com/epubs/pdf/dz9zr006.pdf, (20090407), XP002522211 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | Examination | US6658521 | US2008114906 | by applicant | US5551013 | US5574873 | US5790825 | US6009261 | US6308255 | US6463582 | US2008168208 | US2009182966 |