EP2486330 - HIGH EFFICIENCY DEVICE FOR HEATING ENVIRONMENTS AND HEATING SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Officine Termotecniche Fraccaro S.r.l. Via Sile, 48 31033 Castelfranco Veneto (TV) / IT | [2020/25] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Officine Termotecniche Fraccaro S.r.l. Via Sile 32 - Z.I. 31033 Castelfranco Veneto (TV) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRACCARO, Gimmi Via Sile 34 I-31033 Castelfranco Veneto (TV) / IT | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Maroscia, Antonio Maroscia & Associati Srl Viale Roma, 3 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Maroscia, Antonio Maroscia & Associati Srl Piazza del Castello, 26 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2012/33] | Maroscia, Antonio Contrà Porti, 21 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 10776422.7 | 24.09.2010 | [2017/16] | WO2010IB54320 | Priority number, date | IT2009VI00234 | 25.09.2009 Original published format: IT VI20090234 | [2012/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011036645 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2486330 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2486330 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24D5/08, F24D12/02, F24H6/00, F24H8/00, F24D1/00 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
F24H8/00 (EP);
F24D12/02 (EP);
F24D5/08 (EP);
F24H6/00 (EP);
F24D1/00 (EP);
F24D2200/18 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHWIRKSAME VORRICHTUNG FÜR RAUMERWÄRMUNG UND SYSTEM MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/37] | English: | HIGH EFFICIENCY DEVICE FOR HEATING ENVIRONMENTS AND HEATING SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH DEVICE | [2012/33] | French: | APPAREIL À HAUTE EFFICACITÉ POUR CHAUFFAGE D'ESPACES ET SYSTÈME COMPRENANT LEDIT APPAREIL | [2016/37] |
Former [2012/33] | HOCHEFFIZIENTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMGEBUNGSERWÄRMUNG UND ERWÄRMUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2012/33] | DISPOSITIF HAUTE PERFORMANCE DE CHAUFFAGE DE LOCAUX ET SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE COMPRENANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 30.08.2012 | Observations by third parties | 25.03.2014 | Observations by third parties | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2015 | Observations by third parties | 29.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.08.2017 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2018
25.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Carlieuklima S.r.l./Systema S.p.A./ Impresind S.r.l. Via Fossaluzza, 12 / Via San Martino, 17/23 / Via I° Maggio, 24 33074 Fontanafredda (PN) / 35010 Santa Giustina In Colle (PD) / 20064 Gorgonzola (MI) / IT Opponent's representative Gallo, Luca, et al, et al Gallo & Partners S.r.l. Via Rezzonico, 6 35131 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2018
25.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Carlieuklima S.R.L. Via Fossaluzza, 12 33074 Fontanafredda (PN) / IT Opponent's representative Gallo, Luca, et al, et al Gallo & Partners S.r.l. Via Rezzonico, 6 35131 Padova / IT | 31.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.03.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/31] | Appeal following opposition | 10.04.2020 | Appeal received No. T0934/20 | 18.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 09.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2010 | AL | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | IE | 24.09.2017 | LU | 24.09.2017 | MT | 24.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
MT | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 24.09.2017 | ||
LU | 24.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]WO0244627 (LIM JUNG SOO [KR]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 2, line 8 - line 20; figures 1-7 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 10 * * page 7, line 7 - line 19 * * page 9 * * page 11 * * page 12, line 11 - line 19 * [A] 12-15 [Y] 3-5,9-11 [I] 6; | [Y]FR2854229 (REALISATION MECANIQUES ENGENEE [FR], et al) [Y] 3-5 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS58148320 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [Y] 9-11 * abstract *; | [A]US4079778 (TRUMP GEORGE S) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 21-25, 57-61; figures 1-8 * * column 4 - column 5 *; | [A]EP0228569 (SCHOTT RUHRGLAS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]GB2324146 (JONES PHILOMENA JOAN [GB]) [A] 14 * abstract *; | [A]GB384983 (KARNTNERISCHE EISEN UND STAHLW, et al) [A] 15 * figures 1-3 * | Examination | US4712734 | US4344568 | EP0075526 | by applicant | EP0228569 | US4079778 | WO0244627 | EP0647819 | other | EP0079526 | BE901241 | WO2006120717 | EP0647819 | DE4205540 | EP2551603 | US4582042 | - "Thermal Energy Equipment: Waste Heat Recovery", United Nations Environment Programme (UNEP), (20060000), pages 1 - 18, URL: http://www.energyefficiencyasia.org/docs/ee_modules/Chapter-Waste%20Heat%20Recovery.pdf, XP002648036 | US4344568 | US4401261 | US4512288 | EP0228569 | US5273210 | US4712734 | EP0375470 | FR2565330 | US4699315 | US4258878 | US2003205209 | US4336905 | Opposition | US4344568 | US4401261 | US4712734 | US5273210 | US4512288 | EP0228569 | EP0375470 | FR2565330 | US4699315 | US4258878 | US2003205209 | US4336905 | EP0079526 | BE901241T | WO2006120717 | EP0647819 | DE4205540 | US4633821 | US4582042 | WO2009036927 | US4699316 | US4066210 | US2166355 | US4037567 | US4175518 | US4979491 | DE2803403 | DE2903820 | DE8030771U | DE10062390 | DE20307054U | FR2512177 | GB2025599 | US4392610 | - Sophie Punte et al, "Thermal Energy Equipment: Waste Heat Recovery", United Nations Environment Programme (UNEP), (20060000), pages 1 - 18, XP002648036 | - "Hybrid-System", Schwank Company, (19950000), XP055456295 |