EP2501558 - TIRE WITH TREAD COMPRISING THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/39] | TIRE, THE TREAD OF WHICH COMPRISES A HYDROGENATED THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER | ||
[2013/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 12 cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ, Béatrice 5 route des Martres d'Artière F-63720 Chavaroux / FR | 02 /
LOPITAUX, Garance Les Petites Ouches F-3330 Valignat / FR | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Ribière, Joel Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Ribière, Joel M.F.P. Michelin, SGD/LG/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10776727.9 | 15.11.2010 | WO2010EP67468 | Priority number, date | FR20090058098 | 17.11.2009 Original published format: FR 0958098 | [2012/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011061145 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501558 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2501558 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L9/06, C08L53/02, // C08K3/04, C08K3/36 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
C08L9/06 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/01 (EP,US);
C08K5/548 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L53/025 (EP,US);
Y02T10/86 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L53/025, C08K3/013 (US,EP);
C08L9/06, C08L53/025, C08K3/013 (US,EP);
C08L9/06, C08L53/02, C08K3/013 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | B60C1/00, C08L9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT REIFFENLAUFFLAECHE WELCHE EIN THERMOPLASTISCHEM BEINHALTET | [2013/42] | English: | TIRE WITH TREAD COMPRISING THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER | [2013/42] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE DONT LA BANDE DE ROULEMENT COMPORTE UN ELASTOMERE THERMOPLASTIQUE HYDROGENE. | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/39] | REIFEN MIT PROFIL MIT EINEM HYDRIERTEN THERMOPLASTISCHEN ELASTOMER | ||
Former [2012/39] | TIRE, THE TREAD OF WHICH COMPRISES A HYDROGENATED THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 24.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2010 | AL | 12.03.2014 | AT | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MK | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | SM | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | NO | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | GB | 15.11.2014 | IE | 15.11.2014 | LU | 15.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MK | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
GB | 15.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
GB | 15.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
GB | 15.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
GB | 15.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
GB | 15.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
GB | 15.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 15.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RS | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | |
NO | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004075882 ; | [Y]JP2008231207 ; | [A]US5276094 (KASZAS GABOR [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]FR2854636 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1652867 (JSR CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * examples 1-9; claims 1-21 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 33, Database accession no. 2004-351084, XP002584922 & JP2004075882 A 20040311 (KANEKA CORP) [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 75, Database accession no. 2008-M70792, XP002584923 & JP2008231207 A 20081002 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2740778 | WO9736724 | FR2765882 | WO9916600 | US5977238 | US6013718 | EP1127909 | WO0192402 | WO0230939 | WO0231041 | WO02083782 | US6503973 | WO03002648 | WO03002649 | WO03016837 | US2004051210 | US2004132880 | US6774255 | US6815473 | WO2004096865 | US2005016651 | US2005016650 | US2006089445 | WO2006069792 | WO2006069793 | WO2006125532 | WO2006125533 | WO2006125534 | WO2008003434 | WO2008003435 | WO2008141702 | WO2009000750 | WO2009000752 |