EP2501680 - A PROCESS FOR A PREPARATION OF MARBOFLOXACIN AND INTERMEDIATE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRKA, tovarna zdravil, d.d., Novo mesto Smarjeska cesta 6 8501 Novo mesto / SI | [2016/06] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states KRKA, TOVARNA ZDRAVIL, D.D., NOVO MESTO et al Smarjeska cesta 6 8501 Novo mesto / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUPET, Rok Janeza Rozica 6 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 02 /
ISKRA, Jernej Jakopiceva ulica 7 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 03 /
RUZIC, Milos Milke Kerinove 9 3000 Celje / SI | 04 /
PECAVAR, Anica Gotna vas 18 8000 Novo mesto / SI | 05 /
KOLENC, Ivanka Ulica Slavka Gruma 9 8000 Novo mesto / SI | 06 /
PUCELJ, Joze Avsiceva ulica 16 8000 Novo mesto / SI | 07 /
PLAPER, Igor Smarjeske Toplice 128 8220 Smarjeske Toplice / SI | [2016/01] |
Former [2012/39] | 01 /
ZUPET, Rok Janeza Rozica 6 1000 Ljubljana / SI | ||
02 /
ISKRA, Jernej Jakopiceva ulica 7 1000 Ljubljana / SI | |||
03 /
RUZIC, Milos Milke Kerinove 9 3000 Celje / SI | |||
04 /
PECAVAR, Anica Gotna vas 18 8000 Novo mesto / SI | |||
05 /
KOLENC, Ivanka Ulica Slavka Gruma 9 8000 Novo mesto / SI | |||
06 /
PUCELJ, Jo e Av iceva ulica 16 8000 Novo mesto / SI | |||
07 /
PLAPER, Igor marje ke Toplice 128 8220 marje ke Toplice / SI | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10777039.8 | 19.11.2010 | [2016/06] | WO2010EP67828 | Priority number, date | SI20090000366 | 19.11.2009 Original published format: SI 200900366 | EP20100156733 | 17.03.2010 Original published format: EP 10156733 | [2012/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011061292 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501680 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2501680 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/58 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
C07D215/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | 25.04.2012 | ME | 25.04.2012 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MARBOFLOXACIN UND INTERMEDIATE DAVON | [2015/28] | English: | A PROCESS FOR A PREPARATION OF MARBOFLOXACIN AND INTERMEDIATE THEREOF | [2012/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE LA PREPARATION DU MARBOFLOXACIN ET PRODUITS INTERMEDIARES | [2015/28] |
Former [2012/39] | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MARBOFLOXACIN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKT DARAUS | ||
Former [2012/39] | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLABORATION DE MARBOFLOXACINE, ET INTERMÉDIAIRE À CET EFFET | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 07.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2010 | AL | 10.02.2016 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | ES | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | IT | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | MK | 10.02.2016 | NL | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | RS | 10.02.2016 | SE | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | SM | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9417074 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 15-17 * page 5, line 7 - line 15 * [I] 1-14 | by applicant | EP0259804 | EP0680482 | IT1313683 | EP0155587 | EP0530360 | US4604401 | EP0155587 | EP0680482 | WO02058669 | WO2008030469 | WO2007085760 | WO2007101560 | DE102006010643 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE NO. 291, (1988), pages 548 - 551 |