Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011056657 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2011 | A3 | WO2011056657 | 12.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25546209 | 27.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9358456 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2016 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US94079410 | 05.11.2010 | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 | US201113158050 | 10.06.2011 | US201313828035 | 14.03.2013 | US201113250322 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9981193 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | B2 | US2012143358 | 07.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25546209 | 27.10.2009 | US94079410 | 05.11.2010 | US201113288916 | 03.11.2011 | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 | US91349310 | 27.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8444464 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2013 | B2 | US2012021833 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94079410 | 05.11.2010 | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 | US201113158050 | 10.06.2011 | US201113250322 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8562403 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2013 | B2 | US2011306398 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94079410 | 05.11.2010 | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 | US201113158050 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011306397 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 | US94080910 | 05.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8702485 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2014 | B2 | US2011306396 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94079410 | 05.11.2010 | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10421013 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2019 | B2 | US2013260884 | 03.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25546209 | 27.10.2009 | US201313904835 | 29.05.2013 | US91349310 | 27.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10357714 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2019 | B2 | US2011185309 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25546209 | 27.10.2009 | US91349310 | 27.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2494432 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2019 | B1 | EP2494432 | 05.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US54300 | 27.10.2010 | US25546209 | 27.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2579955 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | B1 | EP2579955 | 17.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 | WO2010US55682 | 05.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2802348 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 | WO2010US55682 | 05.11.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011155958 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35407310 | 11.06.2010 |