EP2432567 - USE OF ANAEROBIC DIGESTION TO DESTROY BIOHAZARDS AND TO ENHANCE BIOGAS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Highmark Renewables Research Limited Partnership P.O. Box 130 Vegreville, AB T9C 1R1 / CA | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiaomei 1124 111A Street NW Edmonton Alberta T6J 6R9 / CA | 02 /
GAO, Tiejun 10846 32A Avenue NW Edmonton Alberta T6J 3B9 / CA | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10777267.5 | 20.05.2010 | WO2010CA00752 | Priority number, date | US20090216733P | 21.05.2009 Original published format: US 216733 P | US20090216746P | 21.05.2009 Original published format: US 216746 P | US20100297063P | 21.01.2010 Original published format: US 297063 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010132987 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432567 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A62D3/02, C02F11/04, C12P5/02, A61L2/00 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
A61L2/0005 (EP,US);
C02F11/04 (EP,KR,US);
A62D3/02 (US);
B09B3/00 (KR);
C10L3/00 (KR);
C12P5/02 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | A62D3/02, C02F11/04, C12P5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG DER ANAEROBEN VERDAUUNG ZUM ZERSTÖREN VON BIOGEFAHREN UND ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER BIOGASHERSTELLUNG | [2012/13] | English: | USE OF ANAEROBIC DIGESTION TO DESTROY BIOHAZARDS AND TO ENHANCE BIOGAS PRODUCTION | [2012/13] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE DIGESTION ANAÉROBIE POUR DÉTRUIRE DES BIORISQUES ET POUR AMÉLIORER UNE PRODUCTION DE BIOGAZ | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 29.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/13] | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2013 | 31.05.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007003940 (UNITED UTILITIES PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-12,14 * claim - * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 5 * * page 7, line 1 - line 9 * [I] 5,6,9,13; | [XI]EP0218896 (SULZER AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,7-12,14 * the whole document * [I] 5,6,13; | [X]DE19628521 (KRAFTWERKS UND ANLAGENBAU AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,10,11,15 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 35 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]DE19809299 (GANTEFORT [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,10,11 * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 20 * * figure - * * claim - *; | [X]DE102007034642 (ABB AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,10,11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] * * figure - * * claim - *; | [A] - "TREATING WASTE WATER CONTG. AMMONIA-NITROGEN AND ORGANIC CARBON - BY ADJUSTING CARBON-NITROGEN RATIO AND SUBJECTING TO ANAEROBIC FERMENTATION", DERWENT, (19820122), XP002902193 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]EP1320388 (GREEN FARM ENERGY AS [DK]); | [X]US4400195 (RIJKENS BEREND A [NL]); | [X]US6299774 (AINSWORTH JACK L [US], et al) |