EP2433082 - CAMOUFLAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polaris Solutions, Ltd. 14 Hamelacha St. Park Afek 48091 Rosh Ha'ayin / IL | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PICCIOTTO, Asaf 19 Hayarden St 63325 Tel Aviv / IL | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2019/18] |
Former [2012/13] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10777457.2 | 23.05.2010 | [2019/18] | WO2010IL00406 | Priority number, date | US20090180141P | 21.05.2009 Original published format: US 180141 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010134080 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2433082 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2433082 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F41H3/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
F41H3/00 (EP,US);
F41H3/02 (GB);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1048 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | F41H3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TARNVORRICHTUNG | [2012/13] | English: | CAMOUFLAGE DEVICE | [2012/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAMOUFLAGE | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 06.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | IE | 23.05.2019 | LU | 23.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 23.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 23.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6127007 (COX PHILIP R [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 6, line 64 - column 16, line 60; figures 1-14 *; | [A]WO03091652 (OMNOVA WALLCOVERING UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 8, line 10 - page 16, line 14; figures 1-9 *; | [XI]US2007082189 (GILLETTE WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1-5,8-14 * paragraphs [0008] - [0046]; figures 1-5 * [I] 6,7 | International search | [A]US4615921 (JOHANSSON LARS E [CA]); | [A]US4671988 (DOWELL JAMES R [US], et al); | [A]US5013375 (LEONARD ROBERT R [US]); | [A]US5976643 (SALLEE BRADLEY [US]); | [Y]US6127007 (COX PHILIP R [US], et al); | [Y]US2007082189 (GILLETTE WILLIAM J [US]); | [A]US7229680 (CROMPTON KEVIN R [US]) |