EP2432416 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREPARING DENTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentca, Inc. 357 Van Ness Way, Suite 250 Torrance, CA 90501 / US | [2019/37] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Dentca, Inc. 3608 Griffith Ave. Los Angeles, CA 90011 / US | ||
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Kim, Tae Hyung 1115 Atlee Drive La Canada, CA 91011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Tae Hyung 1115 Atlee Drive La Canada CA 91011 / US | [2019/37] |
Former [2012/13] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Savi, Massimiliano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Savi, Massimiliano, et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2012/13] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10778289.8 | 18.05.2010 | [2019/37] | WO2010US35324 | Priority number, date | US20090179698P | 19.05.2009 Original published format: US 179698 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010135374 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2432416 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2432416 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61C9/00, A61C19/05 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
A61C9/0006 (EP,US);
A61C9/00 (KR);
A61C13/08 (KR);
A61C19/05 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | A61C9/00, A61C13/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG KÜNSTLICHER GEBISSE | [2012/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREPARING DENTURE | [2012/13] | French: | MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL DE PRÉPARATION D'UN DENTIER | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2010 | AL | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | IE | 18.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.05.2010 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3890711 (BURNS WILLIAM F) [X] 1-14 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1,2,6,7 *; | [A]US6231339 (SKARKY FLOYD E [US]) [A] 15-20 * the whole document *; | [AP]US2009246729 (MASSAD JOSEPH J [US]) [AP] 15-20* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0200134 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [A]US2003180681 (KWON CHIL-SOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2008254406 (WAGNER STEPHEN [US]); | [A]KR20090036643 (LEE CHANG TACK [KR]) |