EP2432794 - TRANS-ACTING RNA SWITCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Research Foundation of State University of New York 1400 Washington Avenue Albany, New York 12222 / US | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TENENBAUM, Scott, A. 9 Ashgrove Lane Selkirk, NY 12158 / US | 02 /
DOYLE, Francis, Joseph, II. 1702 Western Avenue Apt. 2-112 Albany, NY 12203 / US | 03 /
GEORGE, Ajish 3 Pheasant Run Court Timonium, MD 21093 / US | 04 /
ZALESKI, Christopher 140 Wall St. Apt. 7 Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Sharples, Andrew John, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2012/13] | Application number, filing date | 10778508.1 | 21.05.2010 | [2017/35] | WO2010US35870 | Priority number, date | US20090180670P | 22.05.2009 Original published format: US 180670 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010135716 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432794 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2432794 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/02, A61K31/7105 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
G01N33/5005 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
C12N2310/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/141 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RNA-UMSCHALTER MIT TRANS-WIRKUNG | [2012/13] | English: | TRANS-ACTING RNA SWITCHES | [2012/13] | French: | PERMUTATIONS D'ARN DE TRANSACTIVATION | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 20.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2010 | AL | 30.08.2017 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | IT | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | IE | 21.05.2018 | LU | 21.05.2018 | MT | 21.05.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.05.2010 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MK | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
MT | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 21.05.2010 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
MT | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
MT | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
MT | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2018 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004046321 (UNIV BOSTON [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007041213 (ST JUDE CHILDRENS RES HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [X] - VICKERS T A ET AL, "Enhancement of ribosomal frameshifting by oligonucleotides targeted to the HIV gag-pol region", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, INFORMATION RETRIEVAL LTD, (19920101), vol. 20, no. 15, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3945 - 3953, XP002997128 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * | [X] - ISAACS F J ET AL, "Engineered riboregulators enable post-transcriptional control of gene expression", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040701), vol. 22, no. 7, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 841 - 847, XP003002036 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * | [X] - SHINSUKE SANDO ET AL, "Doubly Catalytic Sensing of HIV-1-Related CCR5 Sequence in Prokaryotic Cell-Free Translation System using Riboregulator-Controlled Luciferase Activity", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20050401), vol. 127, no. 15, doi:10.1021/ja0507057, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5300 - 5301, XP055079912 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0507057 | [X] - KHATTAB A F ET AL, "IMPROVED TARGETING OF THE FLANKS OF A DNA STEM USING ALPHA-OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDES-THE ENHANCED EFFECT OF AN INTERCALATOR", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, MARCEL DEKKER INC, US, (19981201), vol. 17, no. 12, ISSN 0732-8311, pages 2351 - 2365, XP001085321 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * | [X] - J. L. CHILDS, "Oligonucleotide directed misfolding of RNA inhibits Candida albicans group I intron splicing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20020820), vol. 99, no. 17, doi:10.1073/pnas.172391199, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11091 - 11096, XP055079409 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.172391199 | [X] - Silverman S.K, Nucleic Acid Switches and Sensors, NUCLEIC ACID SWITCHES AND SENSORS SPRINGER, 233 SPRING STREET, NEW YORK, NY 10013, UNITED STATES SERIES : MOLECULAR BIOLOGY INTELLIGENCE UNIT, (2006), ISSN null, XP002713380 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5554528 (HARRISON GAIL M [US], et al); | [Y]US5593863 (EBERWINE JAMES H [US], et al); | [X]US2005282190 (SHI HUA [US], et al); | [Y] - GORGONI ET AL., "The stem-loop binding protein stimulates histone translation at an early step in the initiation pathway", RNA, (2005), vol. 11, pages 1030 - 1042, XP008148597 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1261/rna.7281305 | by applicant | - COLLER ET AL., GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, (1998), vol. 12, pages 3226 - 3235 | - LECUYE ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 34, no. 33, pages 10600 - 10606 |