EP2493347 - Insole with ventilation system for a shoe and its method of production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/36] | Shoe with ventilation system. | ||
[2014/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gruppo Meccaniche Luciani S.r.l. 155 Via del Lavoro 62014 Corridonia (MC) / IT | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAZIANI, Giordano 38 Via Beato Domenico da Montolmo I-62014 Corridonia (mc) / IT | 02 /
PAGLIARI, Augusto 119 Via Font'Orsola I-62014 Corridonia (mc) / IT | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Cutropia, Gianluigi Ing. Claudio Baldi s.r.l. Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cutropia, Gianluigi Ing. Claudio Baldi s.r.l. Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 10778597.4 | 27.10.2010 | WO2010EP66230 | Priority number, date | IT2009MC00224 | 29.10.2009 Original published format: IT MC20090224 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011051320 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2493347 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2493347 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A43B17/08, B29D35/12, A43B7/08 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
A43B17/08 (EP,US);
A43B7/082 (EP,US);
B29D35/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | 08.05.2012 | ME | 08.05.2012 | Title | German: | Einlegesohle mit Belüftungssystem für einen Schuh und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2014/03] | English: | Insole with ventilation system for a shoe and its method of production | [2014/03] | French: | Semelle intérieure avec système de ventilation pour une chaussure et son procédé de fabrication | [2014/03] |
Former [2012/36] | SCHUH MIT BELÜFTUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2012/36] | Shoe with ventilation system. | ||
Former [2012/36] | CHAUSSURE AVEC SYSTÈME DE VENTILATION | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 20.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2010 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | LT | 23.07.2014 | |
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2005022423 (LAKIC NIKOLA [US]) [X] 1,6,12 * paragraphs [0062] - [0079] - [0084] , [0085]; figures 1-30, 45-50 * [I] 13; | [I]US5996250 (REED RUSTY A [US], et al) [I] 1,6,12,13 * the whole document *; | [I]US2004111919 (WANG HSU-PANG [TW]) [I] 1,6,12,13 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2-15 *; | [I]JPH07265107 (YASUDA HARUO) [I] 1,6,12,13 * the whole document * * An automated computer translation of this Japanese publication can be found on the website of the Japanese Patent Office: http://www4.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/Tokujitu/tjsogodben.ipdl?N0000=115 *; | [I]US5860225 (O'DWYER JAMES M [AU]) [I] 1,6,12,13 * the whole document *; | [I]EP0594518 (GEORGES LEMAITRE CHAUSSURES LE [FR]) [I] 1,6,12,13 * column 2, line 15 - column 6, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2006143943 (CHO JONG S [KR], et al) [I] 1,6,12,13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0043]; figures 1-6 *; | [XPI]WO2010115737 (GRUPPO MECCANICHE LUCIANI S R [IT], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,6-8,10,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 3,9,11; | [A]US2006156575 (LO CHIE-FANG [TW]) [A] 1-4,6-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5826349 | US2005005473 | US2008313930 | US5996250 | US3180039 | DE20119030U |