EP2488370 - PERSONALIZATION OF PHYSICAL MEDIA BY SELECTIVELY REVEALING AND HIDING PRE-PRINTED COLOR PIXELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | [2017/28] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, Rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEIBENGUTH, Joseph c/o Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Dpt 6 rue de la Verrerie F-92197 Meudon / FR | 02 /
LESUR, Jean-Luc c/o Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Dpt 6 rue de la Verrerie F-92197 Meudon / FR | 03 /
BOMBAY, Bart c/o Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Dpt 6 rue de la Verrerie F-92197 Meudon / FR | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/49] | Cour, Pierre, et al Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
Former [2012/34] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10778884.6 | 29.09.2010 | [2017/28] | WO2010EP64447 | Priority number, date | US20090581151 | 18.10.2009 Original published format: US 581151 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011045180 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2488370 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2488370 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26, B41M5/34, B41J2/465, G03F7/00, B41M5/36 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
B42D25/41 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B41M5/26 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B41M5/34 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B41M5/36 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B42D25/00 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B42D25/23 (BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | B41M5/26, B41M5/34, B42D15/10, B41J2/465, G03F7/00, B41M5/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSONALISIERUNG VON PHYSISCHEN MEDIEN MITTELS SELEKTIVER AUFDECKUNG UND VERDECKUNG VON VORGEDRUCKTEN FARBPIXELN | [2012/34] | English: | PERSONALIZATION OF PHYSICAL MEDIA BY SELECTIVELY REVEALING AND HIDING PRE-PRINTED COLOR PIXELS | [2012/34] | French: | PERSONNALISATION DE SUPPORT PHYSIQUE PAR DISSIMULATION ET PRÉSENTATION SÉLECTIVES DE PIXELS DE COULEUR PRÉ-IMPRIMÉS | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 25.09.2014 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.07.2017 | AT | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | IE | 29.09.2017 | LU | 29.09.2017 | MT | 29.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE4339216 (NAKHMANSON RAOUL DR [DE], et al) [X] 1,9,15 * the whole document * [A] 2-8,16-21 [I] 10-14,22; | [XAI]US5543381 (KISHIMOTO YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,15 * the whole document * [A] 2-8,16-21 [I] 10-14,22; | [XI]EP0739677 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 23 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 9; figure 1 *[I] 24-28; | [A]EP0776766 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US6165687 (REELE SAMUEL [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1918123 (MAURER ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2009128615 (MILLER DAVID [GB]) [X] 23 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-3 * [I] 24-28 | by applicant | US2004259975 | US7368217 | - J. ROBILLARD ET AL., OPTICAL MATERIALS, (2003), vol. 24, pages 491 - 495 |