EP2496946 - NT-pro ANP AND sFlt-1 FOR THE DIFFERENTIATION BETWEEN CIRCULATORY AND ISCHEMIC EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/37] | NT-pro ANP AND SFlt-1 FOR THE DIFFERENTIATION BETWEEN CIRCULATORY AND ISCHEMIC EVENTS | ||
[2015/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, Georg Oppenheimer Straße 82 55130 Mainz / DE | 02 /
ZDUNEK, Dietmar Elly-Ney Straße 3 Tutzing 82327 / DE | 03 /
HORSCH, Andrea Christian-Morgenstern-Straße 11 68259 Mannheim / DE | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/37] | Dick, Alexander Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Dudenstraße 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10778941.4 | 02.11.2010 | WO2010EP66660 | Priority number, date | EP20090174873 | 03.11.2009 Original published format: EP 09174873 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011054829 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2496946 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2496946 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2333/58 (EP,US);
G01N2333/71 (EP,US);
G01N2800/32 (EP,US);
G01N2800/347 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NT-pro-ANP und sFlt-1 zur Differenzierung zwischen Kreislauf- und Ischämiereignissen | [2015/02] | English: | NT-pro ANP AND sFlt-1 FOR THE DIFFERENTIATION BETWEEN CIRCULATORY AND ISCHEMIC EVENTS | [2015/09] | French: | NT-pro ANP et sFlt-1 pour la différenciation entre des événements circulatoires et ischémiques | [2015/02] |
Former [2012/37] | NT-PRO-ANP UND SFLT-1 ZUR DIFFERENZIERUNG ZWISCHEN KREISLAUFBEDINGTEN UND ISCHÄMISCHEN EREIGNISSEN | ||
Former [2012/37] | NT-pro ANP AND SFlt-1 FOR THE DIFFERENTIATION BETWEEN CIRCULATORY AND ISCHEMIC EVENTS | ||
Former [2012/37] | DIFFÉRENCIER UN ÉVÉNEMENT CIRCULATOIRE D'ÉVÉNEMENTS ISCHÉMIQUES GRÂCE À NT-PRO ET SFLT-1 | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 30.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2010 | AL | 15.07.2015 | BE | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | HR | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MK | 15.07.2015 | MT | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | RS | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | SM | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | NO | 15.10.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | IE | 02.11.2015 | LU | 02.11.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 02.11.2010 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IE | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 02.11.2010 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IE | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IE | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IE | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2007028070 (BIOSITE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0044] - [0051] , [0096] - [0099] - [0102] - [0103] * [A] 2,3; | [XA]US2007269836 (MCPHERSON PAUL H [US], et al) [X] 1,4-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] - [0009] - [0011] - [0015] , [0023] , [0027] , [0039] - [0040] - [0104] - [0106] - [0116] , [0119] - [0124] - [0138] * * claims 42-56 * [A] 2,3; | [XA]EP1903339 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0015] - [0028] - [0042] - [0043] - [0057] , [0073] - [0093] * * claims 1,2,12-15 * [A] 1-11; | [XA]US2006008829 (HESS GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] , [0028] - [0032] - [0034] - [0035] - [0037] - [0042] - [0052] - [0054] - [0058] , [0125] * * claims 1,3,8 * [A] 1-11; | [XA]US2009155827 (ZEIHER ANDREAS M [DE], et al) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0020] - [0048] , [0073] , [0085] , [0096] , [0100] - [0101] - [0104] - [0105] * * claims 34,35,52,55,58-62 * [A] 1-11 | by applicant | US5744305 | - BONOW, CIRCULATION, (1996), vol. 93, pages 1946 - 1950 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADD. APL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. (USA), (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - NOLAN, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 9 - 12 | - HANLEY ET AL., RADIOLOGY, (1982), vol. 143, pages 29 - 36 |