19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
07.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
22.04.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
22.05.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
14.05.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.05.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.05.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
11.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
14.09.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
17.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2011 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
29.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|