EP2452396 - DUAL POLARIZED UHF ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TagStar Systems GmbH Mühlweg 2c 82054 Sauerlach / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Tagstar Systems GMBH Mühlweg 2c 82054 Sauerlach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENKE, Norbert, Wilhelm Mittelstrasse 130b 45549 Sprockhoevel / DE | 02 /
MIESLINGER, Stefan Bruckbach 4 84051 Essenbach / DE | 03 /
KOBER, Michael Am Wald 18 83052 Bruckmuehl / DE | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Witte, Weller & Partner Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10779332.5 | 29.06.2010 | WO2010IB02193 | Priority number, date | US20090500363 | 09.07.2009 Original published format: US 500363 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011004267 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452396 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/22, H01Q7/00, H01Q1/38, G06K19/077 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2225 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49016 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | DOPPELT POLARISIERTE UHF ANTENNE | [2015/52] | English: | DUAL POLARIZED UHF ANTENNA | [2012/20] | French: | ANTENNE UHF À DOUBLE POLARISATION | [2012/20] |
Former [2012/20] | DOPPELT POLARISIERTE UHF-ANTENNE | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 24.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2015 | 22.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 23.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9635190 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-11,15-18,20,22,25-27 * the whole document *[I] 3,5,6,12-14,19,21,23,24; | [XI]WO9815916 (PAV CARD GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-11,15,18,20-22 * page 7, line 15 - page 10, line 2 * * figures 1-4 * * abstract * [I] 3,5,12-14,16,17,19,23-27; | [XI]US2004046663 (JESSER EDWARD A [US]) [X] 1-4,7-11,15,16,18,20,22,25,26 * page 1, paragraph 22 - page 3, paragraph 47 * * figures 1-9 * * abstract * [I] 5,6,12-14,17,19,21,23,24,27; | [XI]FR2915822 (PYGMALYON SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-12,14,16,18-20,23,26 * page 4, line 27 - page 6, line 13 * * figures 1-6 * * abstract * [I] 6,13,15,17,21,22,24,25,27 | Examination | US6100804 |