Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102656389B | Global Dossier | 07.01.2015 | B | CN102656389 | 05.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009053728 | 18.11.2009 | WO2010EP06641 | 30.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2501961 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2016 | B1 | EP2501961 | 26.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009053728 | 18.11.2009 | WO2010EP06641 | 30.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011060881 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2011 | A4 | WO2011060881 | 26.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009053728 | 18.11.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009053728 | 19.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009053728 | 18.11.2009 |