EP2501598 - TORSION BAR ASSEMBLY AND METHOD, PARTICULARLY FOR RAIL VEHICLE ANTI-ROLL BAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILMARTIN, Duncan 3 Glenorchy Court Oakwood Derby DE 21 2TU / GB | 02 /
BUTLER, Paul 6 B aslow Drive Derby DE22 1JF / GB | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [2012/39] | Application number, filing date | 10779703.7 | 09.11.2010 | WO2010EP06798 | Priority number, date | GB20090020047 | 16.11.2009 Original published format: GB 0920047 | [2012/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057751 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501598 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2501598 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/24 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
B61F5/24 (EP,GB,KR,US);
F16F1/16 (EP,GB,US);
Y10T29/49622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TORSIONSSTABANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN, IM BESONDEREN FÜR DIE QUERSTREBE EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGES | [2012/39] | English: | TORSION BAR ASSEMBLY AND METHOD, PARTICULARLY FOR RAIL VEHICLE ANTI-ROLL BAR | [2012/39] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE BARRE DE TORSION ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ, EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE BARRE STABILISATRICE DE VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 09.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2010 | AL | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | RS | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | IE | 09.11.2014 | LU | 09.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MK | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB1381699 (WEGMANN & CO); | [A]FR2330554 (CIMT LORRAINE [FR]); | [A]DE3510454 (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES [CH]); | [AD]WO2004091992 (DOWNER EDI LTD [AU], et al); | [A]DE102005041163 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | GB1381699 | WO2004091992 |