EP2436358 - RECOVERING SYSTEM FOR TRAINING USER TO MOVE HANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hung Hom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2018/17] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hung Hom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONG, Kai Yu The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
HO, Sze Kit The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
CHAN, Tai Wai David The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Mo The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 05 /
ZHOU, Hongfu The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 06 /
PANG, Man Kit Peter The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2018/17] |
Former [2012/14] | 01 /
TONG, Kai Yu The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | ||
02 /
HO, Sie Kit The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | |||
03 /
CHAN, Tai Wai David The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | |||
04 /
CHEN, Mo The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | |||
05 /
ZHOU, Hongfu The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | |||
06 /
PANG, Man Kit Peter The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Vogel, Andreas Bals & Vogel Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Vogel, Andreas Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 10780074.0 | 26.05.2010 | [2018/17] | WO2010CN73267 | Priority number, date | US20090472295 | 26.05.2009 Original published format: US 472295 | [2012/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010135993 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2436358 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2436358 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02, A63B23/16 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
B25J9/0006 (EP,US);
A61H1/0285 (EP,US);
A61H1/0288 (EP,US);
A63B21/00181 (EP,US);
A63B21/4019 (EP,US);
A63B21/4021 (EP,US);
A63B21/4035 (EP,US);
A63B21/4047 (EP,US);
A63B23/14 (EP,US);
A63B23/16 (EP,US);
A63B24/0006 (EP,US);
A63B71/0622 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0157 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0192 (EP,US);
A61H2201/123 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1261 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1638 (EP,US);
A61H2201/165 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1676 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5025 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5061 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5064 (EP,US);
A61H2230/605 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0627 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0647 (EP,US);
A63B2220/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENESUNGSSYSTEM ZUM HANDBEWEGUNGSTRAINING EINES BENUTZERS | [2012/14] | English: | RECOVERING SYSTEM FOR TRAINING USER TO MOVE HANDS | [2012/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉÉDUCATION POUR ENTRAÎNER UN UTILISATEUR À BOUGER SES MAINS | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2011 | Translation filed | 27.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 16.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2010 | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | IT | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | IE | 26.05.2018 | LU | 26.05.2018 | MT | 26.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.05.2010 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
MT | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 26.05.2010 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
MT | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
MT | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
MT | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9510396 (SCUOLA SUPERIORE DI STUDI UNIVERSITARI E DI PERFEZIONAMENTO SANT ANNA [IT], et al) [I] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US5516249 (BRIMHALL OWEN D [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 3 - column 5; figures 1-3 *; | [X]AT4056U (KAPPACHER JOSEF PETER JUN [AT]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US6502577 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4368728 (PASBRIG MAX [CH]); | [A]US5328448 (GRAY SR RICHARD O [US]); | [A]US5376091 (HOTCHKISS ROBERT N [US], et al); | [A]CN2301196Y (KEHUI MEDICAL APPARATUS CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN2367292Y (KEHUI MEDICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD [CN]); | [A]JP2007020617 (NATL REHABILITATION CT FOR THE, et al); | [A]CN201033143Y (ZHENG SHI [CN]); | [A]JP2008067852 (UNIV GIFU, et al) |