EP2436658 - SILICA CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Quartz Products Co., Ltd. 1-22-2, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Quartz Products Co., Ltd. 1-22-2, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGATA, Shigeru c/o Shin-Etsu Quartz Products Co. Ltd. 1-22-2 Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | 02 /
USUI, Tomomi c/o Shin-Etsu Quartz Products Co. Ltd. 1-22-2 Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10780183.9 | 24.03.2010 | WO2010JP02049 | Priority number, date | JP20090126256 | 26.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009126256 | [2012/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010137221 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2436658 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03B20/00, C30B15/10, C30B29/06, C03B19/09 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
C03B19/095 (EP,US);
C03B20/00 (KR);
C03B19/09 (US);
C30B15/10 (EP,KR,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,KR,US);
C30B35/002 (EP,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1317 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | C03B20/00, C30B15/10, C30B29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | SILICIUMBEHÄLTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/14] | English: | SILICA CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2012/14] | French: | RÉCIPIENT EN SILICE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2011 | Translation filed | 14.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 06.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0463543 (SHINETSU QUARTZ PROD [JP]); | [YD]US5885071 (WATANABE HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [IY]JP2000247778 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO); | [Y]EP1094039 (NANWA QUARTZ INC [JP]); | [Y]EP1319736 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al); | [Y]US6652934 (MIYAO ATSURO [JP], et al); | [A]EP1655270 (SHINETSU QUARTZ PROD [JP]); | [A]EP1956119 (JAPAN SUPER QUARTZ CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH01197381 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP, et al); | [A]JPH05105577 (SHINETSU QUARTZ PROD); | [A]JP3046545B ; | [A]JP3100836B ; | [A]JP2003095678 (HERAEUS SHIN ETSU AMERICA); | [A]JP2009084113 (JAPAN SUPER QUARTS CORP) | by applicant | JPH0422861 | JPH0729871 | JPH07206451 | JPH07277743 | JPH07277744 | JPH09255476 | JPH1025184 | JPH11171684 | JP3046545B | JP3100836B | JP2002362932 | JP2004131380 |