EP2437107 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIHARA, Shoichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
SAKURAI, Takehisa c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
MURATA, Mitsuhiro c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
KOZAKI, Shuichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 05 /
OHTAKE, Tadashi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/14] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10780344.7 | 17.03.2010 | WO2010JP54561 | Priority number, date | JP20090127932 | 27.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009127932 | JP20100006689 | 15.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010006689 | [2012/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010137386 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2437107 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2437107 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337, G02F1/1343, G02F1/139 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
G02F1/134363 (EP,US);
G02F1/1395 (EP,US);
G02F1/133742 (EP,US);
G02F1/134381 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2012/14] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2012/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2011 | Translation filed | 19.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 16.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2010 | AT | 28.01.2015 | BE | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | ES | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | IT | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | IE | 17.03.2015 | LU | 17.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | FR | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | PT | 28.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.03.2010 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 28.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2290437 (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 1-9,13,14 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] , [0075] , [0076] , [0091]; figures 1,11 *; | [A]US2005151908 (NOMURA TAKAIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007097305 (LIN TZU-YUAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US6727968 (BRYAN-BROWN GUY PETER [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005248702 (HOSHINO TOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003086044 (INOUE YUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2000275682 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2000275642 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001108995 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008233412 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH06250184 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JPH02503482 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO.); | [Y]JPH02190825 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | by applicant | JPH11242225 | JPS57618 | JPH10186351 | JPH10333171 | JPH1124068 | JP2000275682 | JP2002055357 | JPH03150530 | JP2005331935 | JP2009127932 | JP2010006689 | - "Surface anchoring energy of liquid crystal with negative dielectric anisotropy determined by saturation voltage method", YOSHIKAZU SASAKI, Extended Abstracts; The 53rd Spring Meeting of The Japan Society of Applied Physics, MUSASHI INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, (2006), page 1365 |