Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010138385 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | US26491909 | 30.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009137274 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2010 | A3 | WO2009137274 | 12.11.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US5212108 | 09.05.2008 | US32751108 | 03.12.2008 | US5212508 | 09.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021275045 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | US201615058932 | 02.03.2016 | US26491909 | 30.11.2009 | US78367310 | 20.05.2010 | US202117176396 | 16.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016174855 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | US201615058932 | 02.03.2016 | US26491909 | 30.11.2009 | US78367310 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015127297 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | US26491909 | 30.11.2009 | US78367310 | 20.05.2010 | US201514593770 | 09.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9304202 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2016 | B2 | US2010305418 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | US26491909 | 30.11.2009 | US78367310 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9746544 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2017 | B2 | US2010231513 | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | US32751108 | 03.12.2008 | US78919010 | 27.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9255986 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2016 | B2 | US2009281765 | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5212108 | 09.05.2008 | US32751108 | 03.12.2008 | US5212508 | 09.05.2008 | US49933509 | 08.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009279107 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5212108 | 09.05.2008 | US5212508 | 09.05.2008 | US43549909 | 05.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009279106 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5212108 | 09.05.2008 | US32751108 | 03.12.2008 | US49938409 | 08.07.2009 | US5212508 | 09.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8072614 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2011 | B2 | US2009279105 | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5212108 | 09.05.2008 | US32751108 | 03.12.2008 | US5212508 | 09.05.2008 | US49936909 | 08.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7978311 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2011 | B2 | US2009279104 | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5212108 | 09.05.2008 | US32751108 | 03.12.2008 | US5212508 | 09.05.2008 | US49931209 | 08.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9285459 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | US2009278800 | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5212108 | 09.05.2008 | US32751108 | 03.12.2008 | US5212508 | 09.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8314770 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2012 | B2 | US2009278030 | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5212108 | 09.05.2008 | US32751108 | 03.12.2008 | US5212508 | 09.05.2008 | US49941409 | 08.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2434945 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2018 | B1 | EP2434945 | 30.07.2014 | A4 | EP2434945 | 04.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | US26491909 | 30.11.2009 | WO2010US35604 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102802509B | Global Dossier | 09.06.2017 | B | CN102802509 | 28.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | US26491909 | 30.11.2009 | WO2010US35604 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102460563B | Global Dossier | 06.01.2016 | B | CN102460563 | 16.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | WO2010US36438 | 27.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2436001 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2018 | B1 | EP2436001 | 17.09.2014 | A4 | EP2436001 | 04.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | WO2010US36438 | 27.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010138741 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18153809 | 27.05.2009 | Type | Divisional application | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 14.03.2018 |