EP2489131 - FM RECEIVER NOISE REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Technologies International, Ltd. Churchill House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 OWZ / GB | [2017/27] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Cambridge Silicon Radio Limited Churchill House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARPE, Jacob 49 Sweetpea Way Cambridge CB4 2GT / GB | 02 /
POPESCU, Andrei 5 Pepys Court Cambridge CB4 1GF / GB | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Cordina, Kevin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2012/34] | Slingsby, Philip Roy Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10781488.1 | 16.11.2010 | WO2010EP67554 | Priority number, date | GB20090020093 | 17.11.2009 Original published format: GB 0920093 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011061177 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2489131 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
H04B1/1676 (EP,GB,US);
H04B1/1661 (GB);
H04B1/3805 (EP,US);
H04B15/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | RAUSCHVERMINDERUNG IN EINEM FM-EMPFÄNGER | [2017/15] | English: | FM RECEIVER NOISE REDUCTION | [2012/34] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE BRUIT POUR RÉCEPTEUR FM | [2017/15] |
Former [2012/34] | RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG BEI EINEM FM-EMPFÄNGER | ||
Former [2012/34] | RÉDUCTION DU BRUIT DE RÉCEPTEUR FM | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 14.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS58187100 (NIPPON MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS MFG) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]EP0418036 (BOSE CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 1 * * figures 1-10 *; | [X]US5253299 (ISHIDA KOHJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 10, line 62 * * figures 1-12 *; | [XA]US2007297622 (SAITO YASUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-3,7 *[A] 2-8 |