EP2509833 - BRAKE SYSTEM OF A TWO-AXLE TWO-TRACK MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STROPH, Ralf Hufeisenstr. 6 85386 Eching / DE | 02 /
PRUCKNER, Alfred Geiselgasteigstr. 32 81545 München / DE | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/42] | Application number, filing date | 10781878.3 | 17.11.2010 | WO2010EP67695 | Priority number, date | DE20091057648 | 09.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009057648 | [2012/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011069790 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2509833 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/10, B60T13/74, B60T13/58, B60W30/18, B60T8/26, B60T8/32, B60T8/48 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
B60T8/26 (EP);
B60W30/18127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | BREMSSYSTEM EINES ZWEIACHSIGEN ZWEISPURIGEN KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2012/42] | English: | BRAKE SYSTEM OF A TWO-AXLE TWO-TRACK MOTOR VEHICLE | [2012/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE À DEUX ESSIEUX ET À DEUX VOIES | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 17.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3410006 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]DE4239386 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1659017 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1a * | Examination | US2008257669 | by applicant | DE3410006 | DE4239386 |