EP2507279 - ALDIMINE CLEANING COMPOSITION FOR REACTIVE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANKE, Doreen Lütt Koppel 8 25486 Alveslohe / DE | 02 /
PASCHKOWSKI, Kai Renettenweg 28 21635 Jork / DE | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technologies AG Tüffenwies 16-22 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10782305.6 | 26.11.2010 | WO2010EP68267 | Priority number, date | EP20090177687 | 02.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09177687 | [2012/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011067168 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2507279 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/32, C07C251/08, C09D9/00, C11D1/40, C11D3/37, C11D7/32, C11D11/00 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
C08G18/3256 (EP,US);
C11D3/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07C251/08 (KR);
C08G18/32 (KR);
C11D1/40 (KR);
C11D3/37 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | ALDIMIN-REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR REAKTIVE POLYURETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2012/41] | English: | ALDIMINE CLEANING COMPOSITION FOR REACTIVE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS | [2012/41] | French: | COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE À L'ALDIMINE POUR DES COMPOSITIONS RÉACTIVES DE POLYURÉTHANES | [2012/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 07.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2013 | Request for further processing for: | 07.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0544058 (FULLER H B LICENSING FINANC [US]) [A] 1-15 * examples 1,3 * * claims 1,3 *; | [A]US5772790 (HUBER LEE M [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 5-8 * * column 5, lines 55-60 * * claim 1 *; | [XA]EP1384709 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [X] 10-13 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * * example 15; tables 2-3 * [A] 1-9,14,15; | [A]EP1535990 (SIKA TIVOLI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0035] * * table 1 *; | [XA]EP2017260 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [X] 10-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] * * examples 16-48 *[A] 1-9,14,15 | by applicant | EP1384709 | WO2005052104 | EP2017260 |