EP2542465 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSTALLATION OF AN ELONGATED OFFSHORE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingenium AS P.O. Box 517 økern 0511 Oslo / NO | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSSO, Jan Rubina Ranas gate 9 N-0190 Oslo / NO | 02 /
HARTMARK, Carl Carl Kjelsens vei 41 N-0874 Oslo / NO | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Onsagers AS Munkedamsveien 35 P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 10782446.8 | 18.11.2010 | WO2010NO00422 | Priority number, date | NO20100000320 | 05.03.2010 Original published format: NO 20100320 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011108938 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2542465 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63B9/06, B63B35/00, E02B17/02, F03D1/00 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
B63B35/003 (EP,KR,US);
B63B73/00 (KR);
B63B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B63B75/00 (KR,US);
E02B17/027 (EP,KR,US);
F03D1/00 (KR);
F03D13/10 (EP,KR,US);
F03D13/25 (EP,KR,US);
F03D13/40 (EP,KR,US);
E02B2017/0039 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0043 (EP,KR,US);
E02B2017/0047 (EP,KR,US);
E02B2017/0091 (EP,KR,US);
E02D15/08 (EP);
E02D27/52 (EP);
F05B2230/604 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2230/6102 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2240/93 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2240/95 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/727 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INSTALLATON EINER LÄNGLICHEN OFFSHORE-STRUKTUR | [2013/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSTALLATION OF AN ELONGATED OFFSHORE STRUCTURE | [2013/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'INSTALLATION DE CONSTRUCTION EN MER ALLONGÉE | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 01.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/52] | 01.08.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 12.10.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2394498 (ENGINEERING BUSINESS LTD [GB]) [A] 3* abstract *; | [XA]WO2006080850 (MPU ENTPR AS [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,11,13,14,21-23 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 7; figures 1-5 * [A] 3-5,7,8,10,12,15-20; | [A]US7112010 (GEIGER WILLIAM CLYDE [US]) [A] 3 * column 5, lines 18-39; figures 1-9 * |