EP2439023 - ELECTRIC TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA Shuji c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10783208.1 | 29.03.2010 | WO2010JP55529 | Priority number, date | JP20090135023 | 04.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009135023 | [2012/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010140422 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439023 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, B25F5/02 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | ELEKTROWERKZEUG | [2012/15] | English: | ELECTRIC TOOL | [2012/15] | French: | OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2011 | Translation filed | 05.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 04.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4950110 (SUZUKI KEIJI [JP]) [X] 1 * columns 2-4; figure - * [I] 2; | [XI]US4179955 (AKIYOSHI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * columns 2,3; figure - * [I] 2; | [XI]US2006291966 (KLEMM ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0074] - [0083]; figure - * [I] 2; | [A]US1886952 (HODEAUX WALTER L) [A] 1-6 * page 2; figure - *; | [A]US5396975 (ROBINSON MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 2; figure - * | International search | [X]JP2006333587 (NIDEC SHIBAURA CORP); | [X]JP2003181778 (HITACHI KOKI KK); | [X]JP2000042948 (RYOBI LTD); | [X]JPS6078253U (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JP2007295773 |