EP2439509 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING STANDARD SAMPLE FOR USE IN QUANTITATIVE DETERMINATION OF RED PHOSPHORUS IN RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIDA, Masuo c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/15] | Setna, Rohan P. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10783280.0 | 24.05.2010 | [2018/31] | WO2010JP58696 | Priority number, date | JP20090134086 | 03.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009134086 | [2012/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010140496 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439509 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439509 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/00, G01N30/04, G01N30/06, G01N30/86, G01N30/88, G01N31/00, G01N27/62, G01N30/54, G01N30/60, G01N30/72, G01N33/44 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
G01N1/286 (EP,US);
G01N2030/125 (EP,US);
G01N31/005 (EP,US);
Y10T436/10 (EP,US);
Y10T436/107497 (EP,US);
Y10T436/16 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STANDARDPROBE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER MENGENBESTIMMUNG VON ROTEM PHOSPHOR IN EINEM HARZ | [2012/15] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING STANDARD SAMPLE FOR USE IN QUANTITATIVE DETERMINATION OF RED PHOSPHORUS IN RESIN | [2012/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ECHANTILLON-TYPE DESTINE A SERVIR A L'EVALUATION QUANTITATIVE DE PHOSPHORE ROUGE CONTENU DANS UNE RESINE | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2011 | Translation filed | 02.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 20.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2010 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | IT | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | MT | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | PT | 01.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.05.2010 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.05.2010 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009036550 (KANKYO TECHNOS KK) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A] - IIDA M ET AL, "Analysis of red phosphorus in resins using pyrolysis-gas chromatography/mass spectrometry", ANALYTICAL SCIENCES, (20080410), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.2116/analsci.24.539, ISSN 0910-6340, pages 539 - 542, XP002774240 [A] 1-4 * page 541, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2116/analsci.24.539 | International search | [A]JPS5931439 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]WO2008133325 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009036550 (KANKYO TECHNOS KK); | [A] - MASUO IIDA ET AL., "Analysis of red phosphorus used as a flame retardant for polymer materials", PROCEEDINGS OF MICROELECTRONICS SYMPOSIUM, (20080918), vol. 18, pages 127 - 130, XP008164422 | [A] - MASUO IIDA ET AL., "Pyrolysis-gas chromatography mass spectrometry of red phosphorus in resins", SEI TECHNICAL REVIEW, (200801), no. 172, pages 30 - 33, XP008166980 | by applicant | JP2004161924 | JP2007326840 |