EP2439523 - BIOSENSOR FOR MEASURING BIOMATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceragem Medisys Inc. No 103-703 SK Ventium 552, Dangjeong-dong Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 435-776 / KR | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jin-Woo 104-506 Sinan Apt. 563 Cheoncheon-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-330 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jae-Kyu 210-1005 Jugong Apt. Wolpyeong-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-280 / KR | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10783522.5 | 30.04.2010 | WO2010KR02738 | Priority number, date | KR20090048676 | 02.06.2009 Original published format: KR 20090048676 | [2012/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010140773 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439523 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, G01N27/416, G01N33/48 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
G01N27/26 (KR);
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
G01N27/416 (KR);
G01N33/48 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | BIOSENSOR ZUR BIOMATERIALMESSUNG | [2012/15] | English: | BIOSENSOR FOR MEASURING BIOMATERIAL | [2012/15] | French: | BIOCAPTEUR DESTINÉ À MESURE UN BIOMATÉRIAU | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2011 | Translation filed | 02.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20020094897 (LIFESCAN INC); | [A]JP2004020465 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]KR20090010510 (DIGITAL BIO TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR100890988B (I SENS INC [KR]) |